EP3042405 - BATTERY MODULE LID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/28] | BATTERY MODULE LID SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2018/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | [2017/34] |
Former [2016/28] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 915 East 32nd Street Holland, MI 49423 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALK, Mikhail S. 9950 Avalon Drive Frisco, Texas 75035 / US | 02 /
DEKEUSTER, Richard M. 5705 Randal Lane Racine, WI 53402 / US | 03 /
CASH, Stephen D. N104W16196 Hedge Way Germantown WI, 53022 / US | [2016/41] |
Former [2016/28] | 01 /
BALK, Mikhail S. 4648 W. Deer Run Drive Apt. 103 Brown Deer, WI 53223 / US | ||
02 /
DEKEUSTER, Richard M. 5705 Randal Lane Racine, WI 53402 / US | |||
03 /
CASH, Stephen D. 337 Lloyd Street Cary, IL 60013 / US | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/28] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14758211.8 | 12.08.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014US50733 | Priority number, date | US201361874472P | 06.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361874472 P | US201414231246 | 31.03.2014 Original published format: US201414231246 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015034634 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3042405 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3042405 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/48, B60L1/00, B60L1/02, B60L1/14, B60L3/00, B60L3/12, B60L11/14, B60L11/18, B60L15/20, H01H47/32, H01M2/12, H01M2/20, H01M2/30, H01M10/42, H01M10/6551, // G01R31/36, G01R31/02, H01M2/32, H01M2/34, H01M4/66, H01R12/71, H02H7/18, H05K1/02 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
B60L3/0046 (EP,US);
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L1/02 (EP,US);
B60L1/14 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L3/12 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60L58/21 (EP,US);
B60L58/24 (EP);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60R16/03 (US);
B60R16/033 (US);
G01R31/3835 (US);
H01H47/325 (EP,US);
H01M10/0413 (US);
H01M10/058 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M10/4257 (EP,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M10/6551 (EP,US);
H01M50/20 (US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
H01M50/271 (EP,US);
H01M50/287 (EP,US);
H01M50/291 (EP,US);
H01M50/30 (US);
H01M50/308 (EP,US);
H01M50/342 (US);
H01M50/35 (US);
H01M50/358 (US);
H01M50/367 (EP,US);
H01M50/50 (EP,US);
H01M50/502 (US);
H01M50/507 (EP,US);
H01M50/528 (US);
H01M50/529 (US);
H01M50/543 (US);
H01M50/569 (EP,US);
H01M50/572 (US);
H01M50/583 (EP,US);
H05K1/0218 (EP,US);
H05K1/18 (US);
H05K3/32 (US);
B60L2210/10 (EP,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
B60L2240/34 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,US);
B60L2240/549 (EP,US);
B60L2250/10 (EP,US);
B60L2260/26 (EP,US);
B60L2270/20 (EP,US);
G01R31/385 (EP,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4278 (US);
H01M2200/103 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (US);
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
H01M4/665 (EP,US);
H01M50/571 (EP,US);
H01M50/597 (EP,US);
H01R12/716 (EP,US);
H02H7/18 (EP,US);
H05K1/0262 (EP,US);
H05K1/0263 (EP,US);
H05K1/0298 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0715 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09327 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10492 (EP,US);
H05K2201/1053 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10545 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4911 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49114 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | H01M2/10, H01M10/48, H01M2/12, H01M2/20, H01M2/30, H01M10/42, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/647, H01M10/6551 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DECKELSYSTEM FÜR BATTERIEMODUL | [2018/10] | English: | BATTERY MODULE LID SYSTEM | [2018/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COUVERCLE DE MODULE DE BATTERIE | [2018/10] |
Former [2016/28] | DECKELSYSTEM FÜR BATTERIEMODUL UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2016/28] | BATTERY MODULE LID SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2016/28] | SYSTÈME DE COUVERCLE DE MODULE DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 24.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2014 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.08.2014 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.08.2014 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5250371 (KLEINERT III RAYMOND J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 19 * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 3,12-17; | [A]JPH08115712 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 40] * * figures 1, 16, 17 *; | [A]JP2009276071 (YAZAKI CORP, et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 28] - [0031] ** figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2010285340 (MATSUNAGA KAZUYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,13-16,22,25-27 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0 41] , [0 45] , [0 46] , [0 50] * * figures 1, 4 * [I] 9-12,18-21,23,24 |