EP3022288 - METHOD TO PRODUCE A SOLID INOCULUM CARRIED IN A SUPERABSORBENT AGRO-PELLET WITH A VARIABLE VOLUME, OPERATING IN A NATURAL MINI FERMENTER. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/21] | SOLID INOCULUM CARRIED IN A SUPERABSORBENT AGRO-PELLET WITH A VARIABLE VOLUME, OPERATING IN A NATURAL MINI FERMENTER, AND PRODUCTION METHOD | ||
[2017/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB7 Innovation S.A.S.U. BP 9 Chemin des Monges 31450 Deyme / FR | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHELLE, René Chemin des Monges F-31450 Deyme / FR | 02 /
MAKOUMBOU, Urbain 1 rue du Maréchal Niel F-31270 Frouzins / FR | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14758590.5 | 22.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014FR00173 | Priority number, date | FR20130001727 | 19.07.2013 Original published format: FR 1301727 | [2016/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015007964 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3022288 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3022288 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/04, C05F11/08, C12N1/14, C12N1/20, C12N1/22, C12N1/02, C12N11/10, C12N11/12 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
C05F11/08 (EP,US);
C05G5/40 (EP,US);
C12N1/04 (EP,US);
C12N1/14 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N1/22 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C05F11/08, C05G5/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE FESTES INOKULUM IN EINEM SUPERABSORBIERENDEN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN PELLET MIT VARIABLEM VOLUMEN ZUM BETRIEB IN EINEM NATÜRLICHEN MINI-FERMENTER. | [2017/43] | English: | METHOD TO PRODUCE A SOLID INOCULUM CARRIED IN A SUPERABSORBENT AGRO-PELLET WITH A VARIABLE VOLUME, OPERATING IN A NATURAL MINI FERMENTER. | [2017/41] | French: | PROCEDE D'OBTENTION D'INOCULUM SOLIDE SUPPORTE DANS UN AGROGRANULAT SUPERABSORBANT A VOLUME VARIABLE FONCTIONNANT EN MINIFERMENTEUR NATUREL. | [2017/41] |
Former [2016/21] | FESTES INOCULUM IN EINEM SUPERABSORBIERENDEN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN PELLET MIT VERÄNDERLICHER GRÖSSE ZUM BETRIEB IN EINEM NATÜRLICHEN MINI-FERMENTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2016/21] | SOLID INOCULUM CARRIED IN A SUPERABSORBENT AGRO-PELLET WITH A VARIABLE VOLUME, OPERATING IN A NATURAL MINI FERMENTER, AND PRODUCTION METHOD | ||
Former [2016/21] | INOCULUM SOLIDE SUPPORTE DANS UN AGROGRANULAT SUPERABSORBANT A VOLUME VARIABLE FONCTIONNANT EN MINIFERMENTEUR NATUREL ET PROCEDE D'OBTENTION | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2014 | AL | 17.01.2018 | AT | 17.01.2018 | CY | 17.01.2018 | CZ | 17.01.2018 | DK | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | ES | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | HR | 17.01.2018 | IT | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | MK | 17.01.2018 | MT | 17.01.2018 | NL | 17.01.2018 | PL | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | RS | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | SM | 17.01.2018 | TR | 17.01.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | NO | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | GB | 22.07.2018 | IE | 22.07.2018 | LU | 22.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.07.2014 | |
AL | 17.01.2018 | ||
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 17.01.2018 | |
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2963361 (AB7 IND [FR]) [X] 1-10 * example 1 *; | [XDP]FR2990943 (AB7 INNOVATION [FR]) [XDP] 1-9 * examples 1-4 *; | [XI] - DAULATRAM B LUND ET AL, "Survival of Rhizobia in Nilgiris peat", vol. 42, no. 12, (19730620), pages 412 - 415, CURRENT SCIENCE, URL: http://www.currentscience.ac.in/Downloads/article_id_042_12_0412_0415_0.pdf, (20140409), XP055113270 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [I] 1-15 | [X] - B. MILICIC, D. KUZMANOVIC, D. JOSIC, D. DELIC, N. RASULIC, "Carrier formulations and their effect on rhizobial growth", ROUMANIAN BIOTECHNOLOGICAL LETTERS, (2006), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 2713 - 2721, XP008168783 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - SIGURBJORN EINARSSON ET AL, "Production of Rhizobium Inoculants for Lupinus nootkatensis on Nutrient-Supplemented Pumice", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (19931101), vol. 59, no. 11, pages 3666 - 3668, XP055112778 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - DATE R. A., "Legume inoculant production", vol. 40B, no. 6, (1976), pages 667 - 686, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INDIAN NATIONAL SCIENCE ACADEMY, URL: http://www.new1.dli.ernet.in/data1/upload/insa/INSA_1/20005b19_667.pdf, (20140409), XP002723286 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | FR2940297 |