EP3038935 - CONTAINER FOR LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurokeg B.V. Koperslagersweg 4 1786 RA Den Helder / NL | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSSEN, Hubert Joseph Frans Zwarte Pad 3 1069 MN Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
VEENENDAAL, Jan Dirk Mr. J. Henderikxstraat 79 NL-1988 AZ Den Helder / NL | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 14759129.1 | 28.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014EP68292 | Priority number, date | EP20130182063 | 28.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13182063 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015028564 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3038935 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3038935 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/04, B65D77/06, B65D8/08, B65D8/12 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
B65D11/06 (EP,EA,US);
B67D7/0266 (EA,US);
B65D11/22 (EP,EA,US);
B65D11/24 (EP,EA,US);
B65D77/06 (EP,EA,US);
B67D7/04 (EA,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2016/27] | English: | CONTAINER FOR LIQUIDS | [2016/27] | French: | CONTENANT POUR LIQUIDES | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 17.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2017 | Observations by third parties | 09.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2018 | 15.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 27.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5339599U (NN) [X] 1-3,5,7-12,15 * the whole document *; | [I]AT6627U (GREINER VERPACKUNGEN GMBH [AT]) [I] 1,2,5,7,14 * page 9, line 14 - line 23 ** page 14, line 4 - line 8; figure 1 *; | [XI]EP1947029 (INBEV SA [BE]) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraphs [0040] , [0044]; figure 1 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]WO2011134949 (EUROKEG BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,7,11,14,15 * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 10; claims 1,8 * * page 7, line 29 - page 9, line 30; figures 1,5A,5B * [I] 6 | Examination | US2012125943 | other | JPS4919985 | WO2011134949 | CN203048570U | EP3038935 |