01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
07.02.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
22.02.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.02.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.02.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.10.2018 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
03.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.12.2017 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
13.10.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.04.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.03.2017 |
First examination report |
|
04.11.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
18.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
03.06.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
12.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
11.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|