EP3027239 - SYSTEM TO DIVIDE LIPOSUCTION FAT INTO ALIQUOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/23] | SYSTEM AND METHOD TO DIVIDE LIPOSUCTION FAT INTO ALIQUOTS | ||
[2018/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomed Device S.r.l. Via Vittorio Bottego, 239-239/1 41126 Modena (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Biomed Device S.r.l. Via Vittoria Bottego, 239-239/1 41126 Modena (MO) / IT | ||
Former [2016/23] | For all designated states Biomed Device S.r.l. Piazza Garibaldi 1 50066 Reggello (FI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTONI, Marco c/o BIOMED DEVICE S.r.l. Via Vittorio Bottego, 239-239/1 41126 Modena (MO) / IT | [2019/09] |
Former [2019/03] | 01 /
BERTONI, Marco Via Vittorio Bottego, 239-239/1 41126 Modena (MO) / IT | ||
Former [2016/23] | 01 /
BERTONI, Marco c/o Biomed Device S.r.l. Piazza Garibaldi 1 I-50066 Reggello (FI) / IT | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Scaglia Est, 19-31 41126 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 14759338.8 | 01.08.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014IB63634 | Priority number, date | IT2013MO00227 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: IT MO20130227 | [2016/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015015471 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3027239 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3027239 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/02 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
A61M1/0209 (EP,US);
C12M47/04 (US);
C12M33/04 (US);
C12M37/04 (US);
C12M47/00 (US);
C12N5/0653 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR UNTERTEILUNG VON LIPOSUKTIONSFETT IN ALIQUOTE | [2018/33] | English: | SYSTEM TO DIVIDE LIPOSUCTION FAT INTO ALIQUOTS | [2018/33] | French: | SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DIVISER LA GRAISSE DE LIPOSUCCION EN ALIQUOTES | [2018/33] |
Former [2016/23] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERTEILUNG VON LIPOSUKTIONSFETT IN ALIQUOTE | ||
Former [2016/23] | SYSTEM AND METHOD TO DIVIDE LIPOSUCTION FAT INTO ALIQUOTS | ||
Former [2016/23] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DIVISER LA GRAISSE DE LIPOSUCCION EN ALIQUOTES | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 19.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.01.2019 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2014 | AL | 30.01.2019 | AT | 30.01.2019 | CY | 30.01.2019 | CZ | 30.01.2019 | DK | 30.01.2019 | EE | 30.01.2019 | FI | 30.01.2019 | HR | 30.01.2019 | LT | 30.01.2019 | LV | 30.01.2019 | MC | 30.01.2019 | MK | 30.01.2019 | MT | 30.01.2019 | RO | 30.01.2019 | RS | 30.01.2019 | SI | 30.01.2019 | SK | 30.01.2019 | SM | 30.01.2019 | BG | 30.04.2019 | NO | 30.04.2019 | GR | 01.05.2019 | IS | 30.05.2019 | PT | 30.05.2019 | IE | 01.08.2019 | LU | 01.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.08.2014 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
MT | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 01.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.08.2014 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 01.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 01.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 01.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 01.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2006029270 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] - [0 85]; figure 3 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]WO2006100651 (BIOSAFE SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0028] - [0029] - [0 36] - [0037] - [0 45] , [0050]; figures 3a-3b,4 * [I] 6,8-10; | [A]US8361042 (GONZALEZ RUBEN [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 13; figure 4 *; | [A]WO2013111130 (ESTAR TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL]) [A] 1* the whole document * |