EP2964743 - PROCESS FOR ACID DEHYDRATION OF SUGAR ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Archer-Daniels-Midland Company 4666 Faries Parkway Decatur, IL 62526 / US | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENSRUD, Kenneth 2017 W. William Decatur, Illinois 62522 / US | 02 /
HAGBERG, Erik 1855 W Riverview Ave Decatur, Illinois 62522 / US | 03 /
HOWARD, Stephen 1649 E Barber Road Sherman, Illinois 62684 / US | 04 /
ROCKAFELLOW, Erin M. 345 N. Lake Shore Drive Decatur, Illinois 62521 / US | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/36] |
Former [2016/02] | von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 14759625.8 | 21.02.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014US17563 | Priority number, date | US201361772642P | 05.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361772642 P | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014137619 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2964743 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2964743 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/08, C13K13/00 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
C07D493/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SÄUREDEHYDRIERUNG VON ZUCKERALKOHOLEN | [2016/02] | English: | PROCESS FOR ACID DEHYDRATION OF SUGAR ALCOHOLS | [2016/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉSHYDRATATION D'ALCOOLS DE SUCRE PAR UN ACIDE | [2016/02] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 23.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2014 | AL | 05.09.2018 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | IT | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | NL | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | IE | 21.02.2019 | LU | 21.02.2019 | MT | 21.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.02.2014 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
MT | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
MT | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
MT | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - FEI LIU ET AL, "Catalytic etherification of glycerol with short chain alkyl alcohols in the presence of Lewis acids", GREEN CHEMISTRY, GB, (20130101), vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1039/c3gc36944g, ISSN 1463-9262, page 901, XP055277892 [X] 1-7,10 * page 908; figure 5 * * page 907, column 2, paragraph 2 * [I] 8,9,11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3gc36944g | International search | [X]US2007173653 (HU JIANLI [US], et al); | [A]US2007173654 (HOLLADAY JOHNATHAN E [US], et al); | [X]WO2012081785 (SAMYANG GENEX CORP [KR], et al); | [A]WO2012121913 (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US], et al); | [A] - YAMAGUCHI, ARITOMO ET AL., "Sorbitol dehydration in high temperature liquid water", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (20110101), vol. 13, no. 4, doi:10.1039/C0GC00426J, pages 873 - 881, XP055278086 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0gc00426j | by applicant | US6849748 | US7420067 | US7439352 | US7772412 | US7982059 | WO2013106136 | WO2013138153 |