EP2962023 - FLOOD PREVENTION SYSTEMS FOR APPLIANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dawes, Kevin 920 S. Heritage Drive West Covina, CA 91791 / US | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEND, Jeremiah Via Double E LLC 689 Pintail Lane Wooster, OH 44691 / US | 02 /
CICHELLO, John 1234 Church Hill Court Wooster, OH 44691 / US | 03 /
DAWES, Kevin 920 S. Heritage Drive West Corvina, CA 97191 / US | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Cordina, Kevin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 14760934.1 | 25.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014US18122 | Priority number, date | US201361769692P | 26.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361769692 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014137650 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2962023 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/20, D06F39/08 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
D06F39/081 (EP,US);
A47L15/421 (EP);
A47L15/4217 (EP);
D06F33/47 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US);
D06F2105/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | F16K31/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | HOCHWASSERSCHUTZSYSTEME FÜR VORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/01] | English: | FLOOD PREVENTION SYSTEMS FOR APPLIANCES | [2016/01] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE PRÉVENTION D'INONDATIONS POUR APPAREILS | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 19.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 20.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3862433 (ROUSSELET LEROY H) [A] 1 * column 1, line 26 - column 4, line 42 *; | [A]US5028910 (MEACHAM HUEY W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 5 *; | [A]US5125247 (MILLS STEPHEN D [US]) [A] 1* column 2 - column 5 * | International search | [Y]US4380243 (BRALEY CHARLES A [US]); | [Y]US4637422 (IZZI SR LEWIS B [US]); | [Y]US7290557 (BOWMAN DENNIS E [US]) |