EP2983345 - ELECTRONIC VIDEO PRODUCT SUPPORTING INTERACTIVE LINKAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yau, Yim Wai No. 317 (South District 1 ) Residential Letter Box Tong Yan San Tsuen Ping Shan Yuen Long N.T., Hong Kong / CN | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | ProI European Patent Attorneys Postfach 2123 90711 Fürth / DE | Application number, filing date | 14761071.1 | 04.03.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014CN72861 | Priority number, date | CN20132099685U | 04.03.2013 Original published format: CN 201320099685 U | CN20132099660U | 04.03.2013 Original published format: CN 201320099660 U | CN201320626445U | 08.10.2013 Original published format: CN 201320626445 U | CN20142028399U | 04.01.2014 Original published format: CN 201420028399 U | [2016/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014135069 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983345 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
H04N21/858 (EP,US);
G06F16/955 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (US);
H04N21/4221 (US);
H04N21/42224 (EP,US);
H04N21/4227 (EP,US);
H04N21/8545 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | H04M1/725, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES VIDEOPRODUKT ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES INTERAKTIVEN VERBINDUNGSSYSTEMS | [2016/06] | English: | ELECTRONIC VIDEO PRODUCT SUPPORTING INTERACTIVE LINKAGE SYSTEM | [2016/06] | French: | PRODUIT VIDÉO ÉLECTRONIQUE QUI PREND EN CHARGE UN SYSTÈME DE LIAISON INTERACTIF | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2015 | Translation filed | 05.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | 29.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2019 | 26.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.06.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2018 | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Paul Holleis ET AL, "Advertising with NFC", Workshop on Pervasive Advertising and Shopping, in conjunction with the 8th International Conference on Pervasive Computing, (2010), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://141.84.8.93/pubdb/publications/pub/holleis2010pervasiveadvertising/holleis2010pervasiveadvertising.pdf, (20160509), XP055271088 [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2 - page 6 * | [I] - Joe Casabona, "What Are NFC Tags and How Do You Use Them?", (20130205), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20130205015647/http://android.appstorm.net/how-to/hardware/what-are-nfc-tags-and-how-do-you-use-them, (20160509), XP055271083 [I] 1-10 * section "Advertisements"; page 2 - page 3 * | International search | [A]CN102682635 (SHENZHEN WANG LING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. ET AL.); | [A]CN102693649 (SHENZHEN WANG LING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. ET AL.); | [A]CN101676970 (SHENZHEN WANG LING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. ET AL.) | by applicant | CN20061072903 | CN20058034624 |