EP3036543 - DIAGNOSTIC TESTS AND METHODS FOR ASSESSING SAFETY, EFFICACY OR OUTCOME OF ALLERGEN-SPECIFIC IMMUNOTHERAPY (SIT) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANCOPOULOS, George D. 1519 Baptist Church Road Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US | 02 /
ORENGO, Jamie 17 Maple Moor Lane Cortlandt Manor, NY 10567 / US | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/26] | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14761497.8 | 22.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014US52295 | Priority number, date | US201361869214P | 23.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361869214 P | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015027154 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3036543 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3036543 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5088 (US);
G01N2800/24 (US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHE TESTS UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER SICHERHEIT, DER WIRKSAMKEIT ODER DES ERGEBNISSES EINER ALLERGENSPEZIFISCHEN IMMUNTHERAPIE | [2016/26] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC TESTS AND METHODS FOR ASSESSING SAFETY, EFFICACY OR OUTCOME OF ALLERGEN-SPECIFIC IMMUNOTHERAPY (SIT) | [2016/26] | French: | TESTS DIAGNOSTIQUES ET MÉTHODES POUR ÉVALUER L'INNOCUITÉ, L'EFFICACITÉ OU LE RÉSULTAT D'UNE IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE SPÉCIFIQUE DE L'ALLERGÈNE (ITS) | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 17.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19178233.3 / EP3564671 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2014 | AL | 19.06.2019 | AT | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | IT | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | NL | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SE | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | LU | 22.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | FR | 31.08.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X] - P. A. WÜRTZEN ET AL, "A double-blind placebo-controlled birch allergy vaccination study II: correlation between inhibition of IgE binding, histamine release and facilitated allergen presentation", CLINICAL & EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (20080801), vol. 38, no. 8, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2222.2008.03020.x, ISSN 0954-7894, pages 1290 - 1301, XP055154245 [X] 1-3,33 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section; Fig. 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2222.2008.03020.x | [X] - CHRISTIAN MÖBS ET AL, "Birch pollen immunotherapy results in long-term loss of Bet v 1-specific TH2 responses, transient TR1 activation, and synthesis of IgE-blocking antibodies", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20121101), vol. 130, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2012.07.056, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 1108 - 1116.e6, XP055154058 [X] 1-3,33 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Methods section (online repository at the end of the document); Fig. E3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2012.07.056 | [X] - A. BABAKHIN ET AL, "Experimental desensitisation using a modified allergen adsorbed onto a synthetic Immunomodulator in a murine model of allergic asthma.", ALLERGY, (20070613), vol. 62, no. Suppl. 83, ISSN 0105-4538, page 252, XP055154300 [X] 1-5,33 * the whole document * | [X] - BABAKHIN ET AL, "Allergen-specific Immunotherapy Using A Highly Modified Allergen And The Immunomodulator Polyoxidonium In A Murine Model Of Allergic Asthma", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070101), vol. 119, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JACI.2006.11.252, ISSN 0091-6749, page S59, XP005756142 [X] 1-5,33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2006.11.252 | [X] - KATARZYNA NIESPODZIANA ET AL, "A hypoallergenic cat vaccine based on Fel d 1-derived peptides fused to hepatitis B PreS", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20110601), vol. 127, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2011.02.004, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 1562 - 1570.e6, XP055014054 [X] 66-72 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section, in essence p. 1563-1564, bridging paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2011.02.004 | [XY] - TERESA E. TWAROCH ET AL, "Carrier-bound, nonallergenic Ole e 1 peptides for vaccination against olive pollen allergy", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20110701), vol. 128, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2011.03.011, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 178 - 184.e7, XP055014321 [X] 66 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Methods section on page 184e.1. * [Y] 67-72 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2011.03.011 | [Y] - GIALLONGO A ET AL, "IgE and IgG antibodies compete for antigenic determinants of Parietaria officinalis allergen", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 17, no. 8, doi:10.1016/0161-5890(80)90095-4, ISSN 0161-5890, (19800801), pages 1019 - 1024, (19800801), XP023680141 [Y] 67-72 * the whole document * * In particular: Title and abstract; Materials and methods section; Table 1; Fig. 4; p. 1022-1023, bridging paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(80)90095-4 |