EP2967579 - MULTILAYERED EXPANDABLE BRAIDED DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inceptus Medical, LLC 8 Argonaut, Suite 100 Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUICK, Richard 22970 Bouquet Canyon Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | 02 /
LUBOCK, Paul 11 Santa Lucia Monarch Beach, CA 92629 / US | 03 /
ROSENBLUTH, Robert 24161 Cherry Hills Place Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 04 /
COX, Brian, J. 3 Novilla Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14762312.8 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US29210 | Priority number, date | US201313844232 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313844232 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014144692 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2967579 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61B17/03, A61M25/01, A61L31/02, A61B17/00 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
A61B17/12122 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12031 (US);
A61B17/12136 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12172 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12177 (EP,CN,US);
A61L31/022 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A61B17/12, A61B17/03, A61M25/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | EXPANDIERBARE MEHRSCHICHTIGE GEFLOCHTENE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2016/03] | English: | MULTILAYERED EXPANDABLE BRAIDED DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIFS TRESSÉS EXTENSIBLES MULTICOUCHE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 25.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2014240 (AGA MEDICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043]; figures 8A, 8B * [I] 5,8,10,14; | [XP]WO2013159065 (LUBOCK PAUL [US], et al) [XP] 1-4,6,7,9,11-13 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0086]; figures 6B, 6C, 6E, 8A *; | [XP]US2014074151 (TISCHLER BRIAN JOSEPH [US], et al) [XP] 1-4,7,9,11-13* paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049]; figures 5A, 5B * | International search | [A]US7727189 (VANTASSEL ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]US2011152993 (MARCHAND PHILIPPE [US], et al); | [A]US2011208234 (MAZZOCCHI RUDY [US], et al); | [A]US2012330347 (BECKING FRANK P [US], et al); | [X]WO2013028579 (COX BRIAN J [US], et al) |