EP2973610 - FIRE RETARDANT COATING FOR HALOGEN FREE CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Cable Technologies Corporation 4 Tesseneer Drive Highland Heights, KY 41076 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAFFER, Tyrel P. 11043 Pleasant Walk Road Myersville, Maryland 21773 / US | 02 /
ALEX, Michelle M. 5212 Waterline Circle NW Canton, Ohio 44708 / US | 03 /
BATES, Eric W. 5511 Frederic Drive Lafayette, Indiana 47905 / US | 04 /
AVADHANULA VENKATA, Subramanya Kishore B24, Nalanda CHS Sector-17, Vashi Navi Mumbai, 400703 / IN | 05 /
SIRIPURAPU, Srinivas 12635 Brandenburg Drive Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14762653.5 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US28972 | Priority number, date | US201361792610P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361792610 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014144522 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973610 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/295 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
H01B7/295 (EP,US);
G02B6/4436 (EP,US);
G02B6/4486 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H01B7/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDE BESCHICHTUNG FÜR HALOGENFREIE KABEL | [2016/03] | English: | FIRE RETARDANT COATING FOR HALOGEN FREE CABLES | [2016/03] | French: | REVÊTEMENT IGNIFUGE POUR CÂBLES SANS HALOGÈNE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1026700 (DSM FINE CHEM AUSTRIA GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2004151906 (PINTO OLIVIER [FR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0018] , [0022]; figure 1; table 2 *; | [XI]US2011174518 (IWASAKI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0029]; figure 1; table 1 * [I] 3,8-15 | International search | [Y]US2003031818 (HORACEK HEINRICH [AT]); | [X]US2004151906 (PINTO OLIVIER [FR]); | [A]US2007246240 (ALEXANDER GRAEME [AU], et al); | [Y]US2012213483 (RISCH BRIAN G [US], et al); | [A]US2012298399 (ALEXANDER GRAEME [AU], et al) |