19.10.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
11.07.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.04.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
25.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.06.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2017 |
First examination report |
|
05.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.05.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
03.03.2016 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
26.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
26.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
22.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
18.12.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
23.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
11.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|