Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9844771 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2017 | B2 | US2016030933 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013049539 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014JP56118 | 10.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150131091 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013049539 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014JP56118 | 10.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105008047 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013049539 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014JP56118 | 10.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2974792 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | A4 | EP2974792 | 20.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013049539 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014JP56118 | 10.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015023132 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2013049539 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014JP56118 | 10.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014142053 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013049539 | 12.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6058433B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2017 | B2 | JP2014172811 | 22.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013049539 | 12.03.2013 |