EP2967301 - SCOPE SENSING IN A LIGHT CONTROLLED ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham MA 02767 / US | [2017/32] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Olive Medical Corporation 2302 S. Presidents Drive, Suite D Salt Lake City, UT 84120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENLEY, Jeremiah, D. 1452 South El Rey Street Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | 02 /
WICHERN, Donald M. 5591 South 1100 East South Ogden, UT 84405 / US | 03 /
TALBERT, Joshua, D. 1763 Fort Union Boulevard Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121 / US | 04 /
BLANQUART, Laurent 2776 Great Smokey Court Westlake Village, CA 91362 / US | 05 /
RICHARDSON, John 22907 Wrencrest Drive Calabasas, CA 91302 / US | [2016/13] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
HENLEY, Jeremiah, D. 7673 Summit Peak Drive Apt. D305 Midvale, UT 84047 / US | ||
02 /
WICHERN, Donald M. 5591 South 1100 East South Ogden, UT 84405 / US | |||
03 /
TALBERT, Joshua, D. 1763 Fort Union Boulevard Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121 / US | |||
04 /
BLANQUART, Laurent 2776 Great Smokey Court Westlake Village, CA 91362 / US | |||
05 /
RICHARDSON, John 22907 Wrencrest Drive Calabasas, CA 91302 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14763338.2 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US29620 | Priority number, date | US201361791685P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361791685 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014144986 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2967301 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2967301 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/06 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61B1/00006 (EP,US);
A61B1/000095 (EP,US);
A61B1/00036 (EP,US);
A61B1/045 (EP,US);
A61B1/06 (EP,US);
A61B1/0655 (EP,US);
G02B23/2484 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEREICHSMESSUNG IN EINER LICHTKONTROLLIERTEN UMGEBUNG | [2016/03] | English: | SCOPE SENSING IN A LIGHT CONTROLLED ENVIRONMENT | [2016/03] | French: | DÉTECTION D'UN SCOPE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT À LUMIÈRE CONTRÔLÉE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2021 | 23.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 03.11.2021 | AT | 03.11.2021 | CY | 03.11.2021 | CZ | 03.11.2021 | DK | 03.11.2021 | EE | 03.11.2021 | ES | 03.11.2021 | FI | 03.11.2021 | HR | 03.11.2021 | LT | 03.11.2021 | LV | 03.11.2021 | MC | 03.11.2021 | MK | 03.11.2021 | MT | 03.11.2021 | PL | 03.11.2021 | RO | 03.11.2021 | RS | 03.11.2021 | SE | 03.11.2021 | SI | 03.11.2021 | SK | 03.11.2021 | SM | 03.11.2021 | BG | 03.02.2022 | NO | 03.02.2022 | GR | 04.02.2022 | IS | 03.03.2022 | PT | 03.03.2022 | IE | 14.03.2022 | LU | 14.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
MK | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 03.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2002028125 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,10,11,13 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0013] - [0015] - [0044] * [A] 6,7,9,12 [Y] 4,8,14; | [XY]US2007225560 (AVNI DOV [IL], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,10,12 * paragraphs [0040] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0218] - [0221] * [Y] 4,8,14; | [A]EP2410488 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0057] , [0063] *; | [A]US2012319586 (RIESEBOSCH SCOTT [CA]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0029] - [0032] * | International search | [Y]US6389205 (MUECKNER ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2004176683 (WHITIN KATHERINE [US], et al); | [A]US2005009982 (INAGAKI JYUN-ICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2007010712 (NEGISHI KIYOSHI [JP]); | [A]US2008158348 (KARPEN THOMAS W [US], et al); | [Y]US2010049180 (WELLS JONATHON D [US], et al); | [Y]US2010171429 (GARCIA RICHARD JEFF [US], et al); | [A]US2011208004 (FEINGOLD BENJAMIN HYMAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2012014563 (BENDALL CLARK ALEXANDER [US]) | by applicant | JP2002028125 | US2007225560 |