EP2959632 - AUGMENTING NAME/PREFIX BASED ROUTING PROTOCOLS WITH TRUST ANCHOR IN INFORMATION-CENTRIC NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xinwen 348 Cardona Circle San Ramon, California 94583 / US | 02 /
XIE, Haiyong 32415 Regents Boulevard Union City, California 94587 / US | 03 /
RAVINDRAN, Ravishankar 2058 Lemonwood Court San Ramon, California 94582 / US | 04 /
WANG, Guo-Qiang 3604 Flora Vista Avenue Apt. 216 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14763988.4 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014CN73339 | Priority number, date | US201361780805P | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361780805 P | US201313970713 | 20.08.2013 Original published format: US201313970713 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014139444 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959632 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2959632 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L29/06 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
H04L9/3268 (EP,US);
H04L63/00 (US);
H04L63/126 (EP,US);
H04L63/1466 (EP,US);
H04L2463/144 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L9/3242 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERWEITERUNG VON NAMEN-/PRÄFIXBASIERTEN ROUTING-PROTOKOLLEN MIT EINEM SICHERHEITSANKER IN INFORMATIONSZENTRIERTEN NETZWERKEN | [2016/01] | English: | AUGMENTING NAME/PREFIX BASED ROUTING PROTOCOLS WITH TRUST ANCHOR IN INFORMATION-CENTRIC NETWORKS | [2016/01] | French: | AUGMENTATION DES PROTOCOLES DE ROUTAGE BASÉS SUR LE NOM/PRÉFIXE COMPORTANT L'ANCRAGE DE CONFIANCE DANS DES RÉSEAUX CENTRÉS SUR LES INFORMATIONS | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 13.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2014 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | IE | 13.03.2017 | LU | 13.03.2017 | MT | 13.03.2017 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012166806 (ZHANG XINWEN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A] - YI CHENG ET AL, "A case for stateful forwarding plane", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130129), vol. 36, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.COMCOM.2013.01.005, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 779 - 791, XP028526438 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.comcom.2013.01.005 | International search | [X]CN101145915 (INST COMPUTING TECH CN ACADEMY [CN]); | [A]EP2259542 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2011264908 (FENG HONGYAN [CN], et al); | [A]US2009287934 (YAMAMOTO KAZUO [JP], et al) |