EP2975086 - VINYL CHLORIDE RESIN COMPOSITION FOR TRANSPARENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adeka Corporation 2-35 Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-0012 / JP | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITAMURA, Ryusuke c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13 Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | 02 /
SENGOKU, Tadashi c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13 Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Kazumasa c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13 Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14764030.4 | 27.02.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014JP01056 | Priority number, date | JP20130049246 | 12.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013049246 | [2016/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014141608 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975086 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/06, C08K3/26, C08K5/098, C08K5/524, C08K9/02, C08K5/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C08K5/524 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
C08K5/005 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K2003/267 (US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/26, C08L27/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/005, C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/098, C08L27/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/524, C08L27/06 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2016/03] | C08L27/06, C08K3/26, C08K5/098, C08K5/524, C08K9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VINYLCHLORIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR TRANSPARENTE PRODUKTE | [2016/03] | English: | VINYL CHLORIDE RESIN COMPOSITION FOR TRANSPARENT ARTICLE | [2016/03] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE POUR ARTICLE TRANSPARENT | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2015 | Translation filed | 07.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 09.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0432495 (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 * examples 6,9 * * page 7, lines 1-4 * * page 9; table 1 *; | [X]JPH11106584 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 26, Database accession no. 1999-308267, XP002761699 & JPH11106584 A 19990420 (KATSUDA KAKO KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * example 2 * | International search | [X]JP2001316549 (KATSUTA KAKO KK); | [X]JPH06100749 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK); | [X]JPH04318047 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK); | [X]JPH04202451 (TSUTSUNAKA PLASTIC KOGYO, et al); | [X]JPH03157437 (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2002294089 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2002138180 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH10330567 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JPH0967489 | JP2003160707 | JPH03237140 | JPH06100749 | JPS624739 | JP2008001840 | JPS462280B | JPS4732198B | JPS5030039B | JPS4829477B | JPS5129129B |