Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105190315B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2017 | B | CN105190315 | 23.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130026604 | 13.03.2013 | WO2014KR02066 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2975410 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2018 | B1 | EP2975410 | 24.08.2016 | A4 | EP2975410 | 20.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130026604 | 13.03.2013 | WO2014KR02066 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1213052 | 24.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130026604 | 13.03.2013 | WO2014KR02066 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014142552 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130026604 | 13.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102017562B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2019 | B1 | KR20140112203 | 23.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130026604 | 13.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI601827B | 11.10.2017 | B | TW201441372 | 01.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130026604 | 13.03.2013 |