EP2970247 - SALTS, CO-CRYSTALS, AND POLYMORPHS OF AN ANXIOLYTIC COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bionomics Limited 31 Dalgleish Street Thebarton, South Australia 5031 / AU | For all designated states Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 301 Binney Street, 2nd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLYNN, Bernard Luke 45 Heads Road Donvale, Victoria 3111 / AU | 02 /
PAUL, Dharam 7 Highfield Avenue St Georges, South Australia 5064 / AU | 03 /
HARVEY, Andrew John 14 Almond Street Goodwood, South Australia 5034 / AU | 04 /
SETHURAMAN, Vasu V. 80 Milner Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 05 /
FORSLUND, Raymond E. 17 Pinehurst Avenue Natick, Massachusetts 01760 / US | 06 /
XUE, Song 18 Turner Terrace Newton, Massachusetts 02460 / US | 07 /
LIVINGSTON, Rob c/o Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc. 301 Binney Street 2nd Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 08 /
HASHASH, Ahmad c/o Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc. 301 Binney Street 2nd Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
FLYNN, Bernard Luke 45 Heads Road Donvale, Victoria 3111 / AU | ||
02 /
PAUL, Dharam 13 John Street Flinders Park, South Australia 5025 / AU | |||
03 /
HARVEY, Andrew John 14 Almond Street Goodwood, South Australia 5034 / AU | |||
04 /
SETHURAMAN, Vasu V. 80 Milner Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
05 /
FORSLUND, Raymond E. 17 Pinehurst Avenue Natick, Massachusetts 01760 / US | |||
06 /
XUE, Song 18 Turner Terrace Newton, Massachusetts 02460 / US | |||
07 /
LIVINGSTON, Rob c/o Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc. 301 Binney Street 2nd Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | |||
08 /
HASHASH, Ahmad c/o Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc. 301 Binney Street 2nd Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14765186.3 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014AU00272 | Priority number, date | US201361798926P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361798926 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014138812 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970247 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, A61K31/4375, A61P25/00, A61P25/04, A61P25/20, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P25/28 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | SALZE, COKRISTALLE UND POLYMORPHE EINER ANGSTLÖSENDEN VERBINDUNG | [2016/03] | English: | SALTS, CO-CRYSTALS, AND POLYMORPHS OF AN ANXIOLYTIC COMPOUND | [2016/03] | French: | SELS, COCRISTAUX ET POLYMORPHES D'UN COMPOSÉ ANXIOLYTIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 06.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/30] | 17.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.09.2019 | 04.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO2008046135 (BIONOMICS LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO2012151640 (BIONOMICS LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO2012116410 (BIONOMICS LTD [AU], et al) |