EP3038633 - STABLE POLYPEPTIDES BINDING TO HUMAN COMPLEMENT C5 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPC Research, LLC 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington New Castle, Delaware 19808-1674 / US | [2020/42] |
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states Swedish Orphan Biovitrum AB (Publ) 112 76 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON, Joakim Mörbydalen 5, 8 tr 182 52 Danderyd / SE | 02 /
NORDLING, Erik Sportstugevägen 14A 182 35 Danderyd / SE | 03 /
STRÖMBERG, Patrik Kanalvägen 28B 191 34 Sollentuna / SE | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2020/42] |
Former [2016/27] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 14765883.5 | 28.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014EP68282 | Priority number, date | SE20130050986 | 28.08.2013 Original published format: SE 1350986 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015028558 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3038633 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3038633 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07K14/47 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/17 (KR,RU);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/195 (KR,RU);
C07K14/315 (EP,KR,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | 24.03.2016 | ME | 24.03.2016 | Title | German: | AN HUMANES KOMPLEMENT C5 BINDENDE STABILE POLYPEPTIDE | [2016/27] | English: | STABLE POLYPEPTIDES BINDING TO HUMAN COMPLEMENT C5 | [2016/27] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES STABLES SE LIANT AU C5 DU COMPLÉMENT HUMAIN | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2018 | Observations by third parties | 22.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20201264.7 / EP3811961 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.10.2020 | [2021/45] | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005090448 (JOHNSON RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 13,22 * paragraph [0059]; examples 1, 4 * [Y] 1-28; | [Y]WO2005075507 (AFFIBODY AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-28 * sequence 59 *; | [Y]WO2009077175 (AFFIBODY AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-28 * sequence 537 *; | [X]WO2012004384 (AFFIBODY AB [SE], et al) [X] 13,14,22 * claims 37, 42, 44; sequence 163 *; | [IDP]WO2013126006 (SWEDISH ORPHAN BIOVITRUM AB PUBL [SE]) [IDP] 1-28* the whole document *; | [IP] - STROMBERG PATRIK ET AL, "Development of Affibody (R) C5 inhibitors for versatile and efficient therapeutic targeting of the terminal complement pathway", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, & 25TH INTERNATIONAL COMPLEMENT WORKSHOP; RIO DE JANEIRO, BRAZIL; SEPTEMBER 14 -18, 2014, (201410), vol. 61, no. 2, Sp. Iss. SI, ISSN 0161-5890, page 256, XP002733197 [IP] 1-28 * the whole document * |