EP3039861 - SUPPORT FOR TRICK MODES IN HEVC STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ, Arturo, A. 5315 Abigail Lane Norcross, GA 30092 / US | 02 /
MURRAY, Kevin 26 Beechwood Fordingbridge Hampshire SP6 1DB / GB | 03 /
LABROZZI, Scott, Christopher 302 Lindemans Drive Cary, NC 27519 / US | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14766072.4 | 28.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014US53234 | Priority number, date | US201361871290P | 28.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361871290 P | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015031659 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039861 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/783, H04N19/51, H04N21/4147, H04N21/845 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (US);
G11B27/30 (US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/47217 (US);
H04N21/6332 (EP,US);
H04N21/8451 (EP,US);
H04N21/8453 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | TRÄGER FÜR TRICKMODEN IN HEVC-STRÖMEN | [2016/27] | English: | SUPPORT FOR TRICK MODES IN HEVC STREAMS | [2016/27] | French: | SUPPORT POUR MODES D'ENRICHISSEMENT DANS DES FLUX HEVC | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2022 | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/22] | 18.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.01.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009310934 (RODRIGUEZ ARTURO A [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0071]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2010215338 (RODRIGUEZ ARTURO A [US]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047]; figures 3, 4 *; | [Y] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Specification for the use of Video and Audio Coding in Broadcasting Applications based on the MPEG-2 Transport Stream", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20121130), vol. BROADCAS, no. V1.11.1, XP014092645 [Y] 1-20 * Paragraph D.3 "PVR assistance"; page 157 - page 167 * | [YD] - "High efficiency video coding; H.265 (04/13)", ITU-T STANDARD, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20130413), no. H.265 (04/13), pages 1 - 317, XP017578238 [YD] 1-20 * Paragraph 3.28, page 5 * * Paragraph 7.4.2.4.3, page 59 * * paragraph 8.1, page 93 * |