|
11.02.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
134 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
134 |
|
27.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
153 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
138 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |