06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
11.02.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
05.03.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
03.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.03.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.10.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] |
11.09.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] |
28.02.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.11.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
18.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.10.2019 |
First examination report |
|
01.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
29.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
01.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
11.11.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
26.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
10.06.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
01.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
07.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|