Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023249554 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | US202318135318 | 17.04.2023 | US201715658239 | 24.07.2017 | US201916580876 | 24.09.2019 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023130608 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230827 | 31.03.2014 | US202217991176 | 21.11.2022 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11628728 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2023 | B2 | US2020020920 | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | US201715658239 | 24.07.2017 | US201916580876 | 24.09.2019 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11296389 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2020161621 | 21.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016752275 | 24.01.2020 | US201715814136 | 15.11.2017 | US201414231092 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11241965 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2022 | B2 | US2020127267 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916716753 | 17.12.2019 | US201414231105 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10608231 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2020 | B2 | US2018083253 | 22.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715814136 | 15.11.2017 | US201414231092 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10593925 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2020 | B2 | US2017012271 | 12.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615276470 | 26.09.2016 | US201414231013 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10511006 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2019 | B2 | US2017317332 | 02.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230387 | 31.03.2014 | US201715650680 | 14.07.2017 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10468654 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2019 | B2 | US2017324075 | 09.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | US201715658239 | 24.07.2017 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3582287 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2023 | B1 | EP3582287 | 18.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14766865 | 04.09.2014 | WO2014US54051 | 04.09.2014 | US201414230387 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042426 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2022 | B1 | EP3042426 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231105 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US54046 | 04.09.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042408 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2019 | B1 | EP3042408 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US54051 | 04.09.2014 | US201414230387 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042407 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2022 | B1 | EP3042407 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231013 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US54053 | 04.09.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042405 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP3042405 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50733 | 12.08.2014 | US201414231246 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042404 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP3042404 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US51534 | 18.08.2014 | US201414230925 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042403 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2020 | B1 | EP3042403 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230827 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US48704 | 29.07.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042212 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP3042212 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US52554 | 25.08.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115621671 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US52554 | 25.08.2014 | CN201480048653 | 25.08.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110474011 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201480048933 | 29.07.2014 | US201414230827 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110034254B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2022 | B | CN110034254 | 19.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US52554 | 25.08.2014 | CN201480048653 | 25.08.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105531845B | Global Dossier | 20.04.2018 | B | CN105531845 | 27.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50733 | 12.08.2014 | US201414231246 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105518960 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414231105 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US54046 | 04.09.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105518903B | Global Dossier | 12.10.2018 | B | CN105518903 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US54047 | 04.09.2014 | US201414231092 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105518902 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414230827 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US48704 | 29.07.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105518901B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2018 | B | CN105518901 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414231013 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US54053 | 04.09.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105518900B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2019 | B | CN105518900 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US54051 | 04.09.2014 | US201414230387 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105518899B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2018 | B | CN105518899 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US51534 | 18.08.2014 | US201414230925 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105518476B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2019 | B | CN105518476 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | WO2014US52554 | 25.08.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042406 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2021 | B1 | EP3042406 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US54047 | 04.09.2014 | US201414231092 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015035023 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231013 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015035021 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230387 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015035018 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231092 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015035017 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231105 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015035016 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2015 | A3 | WO2015035016 | 12.03.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201414230737 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034704 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034662 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230925 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034661 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231239 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034634 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231246 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034599 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230603 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034597 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230749 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034596 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230678 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034595 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230827 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034586 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230475 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034585 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231329 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9457743 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2016 | B2 | US2015072207 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230475 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9985268 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | B2 | US2015072206 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231329 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9698403 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2017 | B2 | US2015072196 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230737 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9440601 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | B2 | US2015072195 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230678 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9831482 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | B2 | US2015072193 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231246 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9825273 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2017 | B2 | US2015072188 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231092 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9722231 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2017 | B2 | US2015072187 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230603 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9660244 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | B2 | US2015072176 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231013 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9711778 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2017 | B2 | US2015072174 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230387 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9716263 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2017 | B2 | US2015070021 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230915 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11529873 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | B2 | US2015072209 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230827 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10581056 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2020 | B2 | US2015069829 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231105 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10211444 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2019 | B2 | US2015072175 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230925 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10103374 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2018 | B2 | US2015072208 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414230749 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10044018 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2018 | B2 | US2015072177 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414231239 | 31.03.2014 | US201361874472 | 06.09.2013 |