Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160051838 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414476482 | 03.09.2014 | WO2014US54144 | 04.09.2014 | US201361874075 | 05.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016529065 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414476482 | 03.09.2014 | WO2014US54144 | 04.09.2014 | US201361874075 | 05.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105492868B | Global Dossier | 26.06.2018 | B | CN105492868 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414476482 | 03.09.2014 | WO2014US54144 | 04.09.2014 | US201361874075 | 05.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042154 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2018 | B1 | EP3042154 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414476482 | 03.09.2014 | WO2014US54144 | 04.09.2014 | US201361874075 | 05.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015035085 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414476482 | 03.09.2014 | US201361874075 | 05.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9622687 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2015066422 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414476482 | 03.09.2014 | US201361874075 | 05.09.2013 |