EP2971666 - METHOD FOR FORMING A DIFFUSION COOLING HOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/03] | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR THE ADDITION OF FEATURES WITHIN COOLING HOLES | ||
[2020/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, JinQuan 30 Frederick T. Miller Way East Greenwich, RI 02818 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/07] | 01 /
XU, JinQuan 30 Frederick T. Miller Way East Greenwick, RI 02818 / US | ||
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
XU, JinQuan 11 Ledgewood Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/43] |
Former [2016/03] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14767556.5 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US23393 | Priority number, date | US201361790122P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361790122 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014150490 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2971666 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2971666 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
B22F7/08 (US);
B23K15/0086 (US);
B23K15/0093 (US);
B23K26/0006 (US);
B23K26/342 (US);
B28B1/001 (US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
F01D9/065 (EP,US);
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
B23K2103/02 (EP,US);
B23K2103/08 (EP,US);
B23K2103/52 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
F05D2230/10 (US);
F05D2230/12 (EP,US);
F05D2230/13 (EP,US);
F05D2230/14 (EP,US);
F05D2230/31 (EP,US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2214 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | F02C7/12, F01D25/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BILDEN EINES DIFFUSIONSKÜHLLOCHS | [2020/43] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A DIFFUSION COOLING HOLE | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FORMATION D'UN TROU DE REFROIDISSEMENT PAR DIFFUSION | [2020/21] |
Former [2016/03] | ADDITIVHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HINZUFÜGUNG VON FUNKTIONEN IN KÜHLBOHRUNGEN | ||
Former [2016/03] | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR THE ADDITION OF FEATURES WITHIN COOLING HOLES | ||
Former [2016/03] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE POUR L'AJOUT DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DANS DES ORIFICES DE REFROIDISSEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 20.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2020 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2014 | AL | 21.10.2020 | AT | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | DK | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | ES | 21.10.2020 | FI | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | IT | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | NL | 21.10.2020 | PL | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SE | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | TR | 21.10.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | NO | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | IE | 11.03.2021 | LU | 11.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | FR | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MK | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
TR | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MK | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 21.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH1089005 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-15 * figure - *; | [Y]US2005123401 (BUNKER RONALD S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0058] ** figures 13,14 *; | [Y]GB2409243 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figure - *; | [Y]US2010040459 (OHKITA YOJI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figure - * | International search | [A]US6210488 (BRUCE ROBERT W [US]); | [A]US6368060 (FEHRENBACH JEFFREY ARNOLD [US], et al); | [Y]US2011143042 (PERETTI MICHAEL W [US], et al); | [A]US7997868 (LIANG GEORGE [US]); | [Y]US2011293423 (BUNKER RONALD SCOTT [US], et al) |