EP2976604 - SELF-CALIBRATING ULTRASONIC-BASED MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Western Ontario 100 Collip Circle, Suite 105 London, ON N6G 4X8 / CA | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAKASH, Anand 187 Ambleside Drive London, Ontario N6G 5B9 / CA | 02 /
SHUKLA, Abhishek 1405 595 Proudfoot Lane London, Ontario N6H 4S1 / CA | 03 /
HONE, Richard 15 Campbell Court RR 2 Ilderton, Ontario N0M 2A0 / CA | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | O'Neill, Brian FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14767882.5 | 21.03.2014 | [2016/04] | WO2014CA50301 | Priority number, date | US201361804374P | 22.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361804374 P | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014146208 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2976604 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01F25/00, G01F23/28, G01F23/296, G01F23/64, // G01S15/10, G01S7/52 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
G01F23/2962 (EP,US);
G01F25/20 (US);
G01F23/64 (EP,US);
G01S15/10 (EP,US);
G01S7/52004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/04] | G01F25/00, G01F23/28, G01F23/296 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Title | German: | SELBSTKALIBRIERENDES ULTRASCHALLBASIERTES ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/04] | English: | SELF-CALIBRATING ULTRASONIC-BASED MONITORING SYSTEM | [2016/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE BASÉ SUR ULTRASONS À AUTO-ÉTALONNAGE | [2016/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 07.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4719605 (EDER KENNETH C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]EP0845663 (SIMMONDS PRECISION PRODUCTS [US]) [X] 1,9,12 * figure 1 * * claim 7 *; | [X]US2004007061 (FORGUE JOHN R [US]) [X] 1,9,12 * figure 4 * * claims 17-18 *; | [A]US2005284217 (MIYAGAWA ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 6 * paragraph [0079] *; | [XI]WO2008101339 (SENSOTECH INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-10,12-14 * figures 1,2,7,8 * * paragraphs [0037] , [ 0056] * * claim 9 * * paragraphs [0095] , [ 00112] * [I] 4,6,11,15; | [A]WO2012150002 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 11 * figure 5 * | International search | [Y]US4719605 (EDER KENNETH C [US], et al); | [X]CA1264195 (CANADA MAJESTY IN RIGHT OF); | [Y]US5142504 (KOESTER HARRY [DE], et al) |