EP2971282 - MICROVESICLE HISTONE H2AX AS A BIOMARKER FOR GENOTOXIC STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioma Inc. 1827 South Bayshore Lane Miami, FL 33133 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EZRIN, Alan, M. 1827 South Bayshore Lane Miami, FL 33133 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 14767965.8 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US28079 | Priority number, date | US201361785552P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361785552 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014152873 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2971282 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2971282 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/6886 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/6875 (EP,US);
G01N33/57496 (US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/142 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | C40B30/04, C12Q1/68, G01N33/566 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROVESIKELHISTON H2AX ALS BIOMARKER FÜR GENOTOXISCHEN STRESS | [2016/03] | English: | MICROVESICLE HISTONE H2AX AS A BIOMARKER FOR GENOTOXIC STRESS | [2016/03] | French: | HISTONE H2AX MICROVÉSICULAIRE EN TANT QUE BIOMARQUEUR POUR LE STRESS GÉNOTOXIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 06.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 19.09.2018 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | ES | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | LU | 14.03.2019 | MT | 14.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2202522 (UNIV LEIDEN [NL]) [Y] 18* examples; claims *; | [Y]WO2012168184 (MEDIPAN GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-19 * examples; claims *; | [Y] - JENNIFER S DICKEY ET AL, "H2AX: functional roles and potential applications", CHROMOSOMA ; BIOLOGY OF THE NUCLEUS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20090826), vol. 118, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S00412-009-0234-4, ISSN 1432-0886, pages 683 - 692, XP019760098 [Y] 1-19 * page 689; "Conclusion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00412-009-0234-4 | [Y] - J. PALMA ET AL, "MicroRNAs are exported from malignant cells in customized particles", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, GB, (20120101), vol. 40, no. 18, doi:10.1093/nar/gks656, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 9125 - 9138, XP055292912 [Y] 1-19 * page 9132, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gks656 | [Y] - CLINGEN P H ET AL, "Histone H2AX phosphorylation as a molecular pharmacological marker for DNA interstrand crosslink cancer chemotherapy", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 76, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BCP.2008.03.025, ISSN 0006-2952, (20080701), pages 19 - 27, (20080416), XP022757456 [Y] 1-19 * abstract; page 26, last sentence * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2008.03.025 | [Y] - L-J MAH ET AL, "[gamma]H2AX: a sensitive molecular marker of DNA damage and repair", LEUKEMIA., US, (20100204), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.1038/leu.2010.6, ISSN 0887-6924, pages 679 - 686, XP055326988 [Y] 1-19 * page 682-683 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/leu.2010.6 | International search | [Y] - DICKEY ET AL., "H2AX: functional roles and potential applications.", CHROMOSOMA, (200912), vol. 118, no. 6, doi:10.1007/s00412-009-0234-4, pages 683 - 692, XP019760098 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00412-009-0234-4 | [Y] - PALMA ET AL., "MicroRNAs are exported from malignant cells in customized particles.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20120101), vol. 40, no. 18, doi:10.1093/nar/gks656, pages 9125 - 9138, XP055292912 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gks656 | [Y] - ZHANG ET AL., "Temozolomide: Mechanisms of action, repair and resistance", CURRENT MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (20120101), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.2174/1874467211205010102, pages 102 - 114, XP055292915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1874467211205010102 | [Y] - POMMIER ET AL., "The indenoisoquinolines noncamptothecin topoisomerase I inhibitors: Update and perspectives", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, (20090501), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-08-0706, pages 1008 - 1014, XP055292917 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-08-0706 | by applicant | US6812023 | US6899863 | - HARTMANN et al., Lancet, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 383 - 390 | - ANDERSON; ANDERSON, Mol Cell Proteomics, (20020000), vol. 1.11, pages 845 - 867 | - SANCHEZ-CARBAYO, Tumor Biol, (20100000), vol. 31, pages 103 - 112 | - BROWN C., "Antigen retrieval methods for immunohistochemistry", Toxicol Pathol, (19980000), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 830 - 1 | - ONORATO et al., "Immunohistochemical and ELISA assays for biomarkers of oxidative stress in aging and disease", Ann NY Acad Sci, (19980000), vol. 20, no. 854, pages 277 - 90 | - LAEMMELI UK, "Cleavage of structural proteins during the assembly of the head of a bacteriophage T4", Nature, (19700000), vol. 227, pages 680 - 685 | - EGGER; BIENZ, "Protein (western) blotting", Mol Biotechnol, (19940000), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1007/BF02921696, pages 289 - 305, XP001023417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02921696 | - HUANG, "Detection of multiple proteins in an antibody-based protein microarray system", Immunol Methods, (20010000), vol. 255, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(01)00394-5, pages 1 - 13, XP004274816 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(01)00394-5 | - Methods in Cell Biology: Antibodies in Cell Biology, (19930000), vol. 37 | - COCUCCI et al., Traffic, (20070000), vol. 8, pages 742 - 757 | - SIMPSON et al., Proteomics, (20080000), vol. 8, pages 4083 - 4099 | - RAPOSO et al., J Exp Med, (19960000), vol. 183, pages 1161 - 72 | - TAYLOR; GERCEL-TAYLOR, Gynecol Oncol, (20080000), vol. 110, pages 13 - 21 | - CHERUVANKY et al., Am J Physiol Renal Physiol, (20070000), vol. 292, pages 1657 - 61 | - NAGRATH et al., Nature, (20070000), vol. 450, pages 1235 - 9 | - CABY et al., Inter Immunol, (20050000), vol. 17, no. 7, pages 879 - 887 | - BARD, MP et al., Am JRespir Cell Mol Biol, (20040000), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 114 - 21 | - HEGMANS, JP et al., Am J Pathol, (20040000), vol. 164, no. 5, pages 1807 - 15 | - MEARS, R et al., Proteomics, (20040000), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 4019 - 31 | - CHOI, DS et al., J Proteome Res, (20070000), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 4646 - 55 | - LATERZA et al., Clin Chem, (20060000), vol. 52, no. 9, pages 1713 - 21 | - WUBBOLTS R; LECKIE RS; VEENHUIZEN PT; SCHWARZMANN G; MOBIUS W; HOERNSCHEMEYER J; SLOT JW; GEUZE HJ; STOORVOGEL W, JBiol Chem, (20030328), vol. 278, no. 13, pages 10963 - 72 | - TAYLOR, C.G.; ATAY, S.; TULLIS, R.H.; KESIMER, M; TAYLOR, D.D., Anal. Biochem., (20120000), vol. 28, no. 1, pages 44 - 53 | - BOTELHO et al., J. Proteome Res., (20100000), vol. 9, pages 2863 - 2870 | - YATES et al., Anal. Chem., (20040000), vol. 76, pages 4193 - 4201 |