Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018132985 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | US201815869720 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11660174 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2023 | B2 | US2022125562 | 28.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | US201815869657 | 12.01.2018 | US202217572028 | 10.01.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11219512 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2022 | B2 | US2018132984 | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | US201815869657 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102164516B | Global Dossier | 12.10.2020 | B1 | KR20160012995 | 03.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016517308 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL241589 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4324426 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2024 | A3 | EP4324426 | 21.02.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | EP14768210 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105407833B | Global Dossier | 13.06.2017 | B | CN105407833 | 16.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014235466 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2015 | A8 | AU2014235466 | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2967770 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2017 | A4 | EP2967770 | 20.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015022891 | 17.05.2022 | B1 | BR112015022891 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2907240 | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA38412 | 30.09.2016 | B1 | MA38412 | 29.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA40099 | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA40100 | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA40101 | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015012483 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA515361144 | 15.08.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201507161 | 19.12.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US24579 | 12.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014150929 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2014 | A3 | WO2014150929 | 25.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9901428 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2018 | B2 | US2014272787 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7282812B | Global Dossier | 29.05.2023 | B2 | JP2021053472 | 08.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Divisional application |