EP2967770 - DENTAL DEVICES AND SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Good Fit Technologies, LLC 8 Faneuil Hall Marketplace, 3rd Fl Boston, MA 02109 / US | [2017/33] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Good Fit Technologies, Inc. 8 Faneuil Hall Marketplace, 3rd Fl Boston, MA 02109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GINSBURG, Stephen 9 Everett St. Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | 02 /
GINSBURG, Marc 88 Perry St. Apt. 5F New York, NY 10014 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Johnson, Carrie-Anne Louise Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14768210.8 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US24579 | Priority number, date | US201313842788 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313842788 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014150929 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2967770 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/007, A61C13/01, A61C13/113, A61C13/20, A61C13/34 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61C13/04 (EP,IL,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,IL,US);
A61C13/0003 (IL,US);
A61C13/0022 (EP,IL,US);
A61C13/01 (EP,IL,US);
A61C13/1003 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | ZAHNÄRZTLICHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2016/03] | English: | DENTAL DEVICES AND SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING THE SAME | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DENTAIRES, ET LEURS SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 23.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 01.08.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.08.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/52] | Divisional application(s) | EP23202280.6 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2019 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU483943B ; | [X]US4654006 (KUSANO TAKAE [JP], et al); | [X]WO0027556 (ADVANCED RES & TECH INST [US], et al); | [X]JP2008168065 (YUNIKKUSU JAPAN KK) | International search | [X]US3813777 (VAN HANDEL A, et al); | [Y]US4808184 (TEPIC SLOBODAN [CH]); | [A]US5775900 (GINSBURG STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [X]US2007190488 (RUSLER ROBERT L [US]); | [Y]US2008108007 (KONG SEONG KON [US], et al); | [X]US2010297581 (WALLACE LAWRENCE NORMAN [US]); | [Y]US2012107771 (HRENAK CAROL [US]) | by applicant | AU483943B | US4654006 | WO0027556 |