EP2974035 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND SIGMA-DELTA LOOP MEMS ACQUISITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semtech Corporation 200 Flynn Road Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVROULET, Michel Avenue Du Mail 34 CH-2000 Neuchatel / CH | 02 /
NYS, Olivier Pertuis Du Sault 58 CH-2000 Neuchatel / CH | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14769232.1 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US23786 | Priority number, date | US201361788286P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361788286 P | US201414159926 | 21.01.2014 Original published format: US201414159926 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014150613 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2974035 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2974035 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/24 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
G01D5/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H03M3/00, H03M3/02, H03M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND SIGMA-DELTA-SCHLEIFEN-MEMS-ERFASSUNG | [2016/03] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND SIGMA-DELTA LOOP MEMS ACQUISITION | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET ACQUISITION DE MEMS DE BOUCLE SIGMA-DELTA | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 23.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2014 | AL | 03.01.2018 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | MK | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | RS | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | SM | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | IE | 11.03.2018 | LU | 11.03.2018 | MT | 11.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | NO | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 03.01.2018 | |
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003076249 (DUMMERMUTH ERNST H [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0073] *; | [X]US2007180924 (WARREN ODEN L [US], et al) [X] 1-12* paragraphs [0079] - [0179] *; | [X]US2009204350 (GOVIL ALOK [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0063] - [0175] *; | [X]US2013051582 (KROPFITSCH MICHAEL [AT], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016] - [0063] * | International search | [A]US2010315272 (STEELE COLIN FINDLAY [GB], et al); | [X]US8000789 (DENISON TIMOTHY J [US]); | [A]US8134375 (BOOM JEROEN VAN DEN [NL]) | by applicant | US2003076249 | US2007180924 | US2009204350 | US8000789 | US2013051582 |