EP2969390 - GUARD LOCK RELEASE MECHANISM FOR POWER SAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Winternitz, Daniel 2625 N. Clark 1803 Chicago, IL 60614 / US | |||
For all designated states Koegel, Jan 439 S. Home Avenue Oak Park, IL 60302 / US | |||
For all designated states Yao, Ji 85 Shuang Le Guarden Room 702 Qin Huai District Nanjing, Jiangsu Province 210004 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINTERNITZ, Daniel 2625 N. Clark 1803 Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 02 /
KOEGEL, Jan 439 S. Home Avenue Oak Park, IL 60302 / US | 03 /
YAO, Ji Room 702 No.85 Shuang Le Guarden Qin Huai District Jiang Su Province Nanjing 210004 / CN | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH, C/IPE P.O. Box 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14769351.9 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US23576 | Priority number, date | US201361792602P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361792602 P | US201361792776P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361792776 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014150549 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2969390 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B24B27/06 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
B27G19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | SCHUTZVERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR MOTORSÄGE | [2016/03] | English: | GUARD LOCK RELEASE MECHANISM FOR POWER SAW | [2016/03] | French: | MÉCANISME DE LIBÉRATION D'UN VERROUILLAGE DE PROTECTION POUR UNE SCIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5918522 (BENEDICT CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-13,15,16 * abstract * * figure - * * column 1, line 10 - line 18 * * column 3, line 53 - line 58 * * column 4, line 28 - line 62 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 2 * [I] 4,8,13,14,17; | [X]US5129300 (KAWAKAMI HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE22574 (ADOLPH TRINCANO) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE15191 (C REIMANN) [A] 1,10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002134211 (BETTACCHINI ET AL.); | [A]US2009235796 (KANI ET AL.); | [A]JP3263280B (MAKITA CORP.); | [A]US2008295663 (HSIEH ET AL.); | [A]US5778747 (CHEN, RUEY-ZON) | by applicant | US5918522 |