EP3036510 - PRESSURE-BASED GAS FLOW CONTROLLER WITH DYNAMIC SELF-CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horwitz, Christopher, Max 2200 Beechwood Boulevard Pittsburgh, PA 15217 / US | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Stratagem IPM Limited Meridian Court Comberton Road Toft, Cambridge CB23 2RY / GB | [2021/23] |
Former [2016/26] | Emerson, Peter James Page Hargrave Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14769464.0 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014US27698 | Priority number, date | US201361785235P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361785235 P | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014152755 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3036510 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3036510 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/00, E03B1/00, G01F25/00, G05D7/06 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
G05D7/0635 (EP,US);
G01F1/76 (US);
G01F1/86 (US);
G01F1/88 (US);
G01F25/15 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/26] | G01F1/00, E03B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | DRUCKBASIERTE GASSTRÖMUNGSSTEUERUNG MIT DYNAMISCHER SELBSTKALIBRIERUNG | [2016/26] | English: | PRESSURE-BASED GAS FLOW CONTROLLER WITH DYNAMIC SELF-CALIBRATION | [2016/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ÉCOULEMENT DE GAZ BASÉ SUR LA PRESSION ET PRÉSENTANT UN AUTO-ÉTALONNAGE DYNAMIQUE | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2016/26] | 19.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 24.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2020 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2016 | Decision despatched | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2016 | Decision despatched | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 09.06.2021 | AT | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | ES | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | IT | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | MK | 09.06.2021 | NL | 09.06.2021 | PL | 09.06.2021 | RO | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SE | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | GR | 10.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | PT | 11.10.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4285245 (KENNEDY LYN R) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003000578 (LOWERY PATRICK A [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003234039 (SHAJII ALI [US], et al) [Y] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]US2009143998 (DE CRISTOFARO FERDINANDO [IT], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO0073868 (CYBER INSTR TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]); | [Y]US2002198668 (LULL JOHN M [US], et al); | [X]US2003000578 (LOWERY PATRICK A [US], et al); | [Y]US2008300802 (LAKHANI IQBAL [CA], et al); | [Y]US2009143998 (DE CRISTOFARO FERDINANDO [IT], et al); | [Y]US2011220213 (CABRERA RAFAEL A [US], et al) | by applicant | US4285245 | US4364413 | US5394755 | US5868159 | US5925829 | US6119710 | US6216726 | US6363958 | US6450200 | US2003000578 | US6631334 | US7107834 | US7225085 | US7243538 | US2008035202 | US7412986 | US7424346 | US7424895 | US2009143998 | US2010251828 | US7823436 | US7975558 | US8010303 | US8150553 | US8205629 | US8240324 | US8265795 | - C. M. HORWITZ, "Simple Calibrated Gas Feed System", Rev. Sci. Instrum., (19790500), vol. 50, no. 5, pages 652 - 654 | - BROWN, ROBERT L.SCHWARTZ, JAMES M., "Pressure based mass flow control for ion implant SDS applications", Proceedings of International Conference on Ion Implantation Technology, (19980000), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/IIT.1999.812130, pages 369 - 372, XP010362005 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IIT.1999.812130 | - J. J. SULLIVANS. SCHAFFERR. P. JACOBS, "Mass flow measurement and control of low vapor pressure sources", J. Vac. Sci. Technol. A, (19890000), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 2387 - 2393 |