EP2983662 - ACTIVATED SOY POD FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microbiome Therapeutics, LLC. 11001 W. 120th Avenue Suite 400 Broomfield, Colorado 80021 / US | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIMAN, Mark L. c/o Microbiome Therapeutics LLC. 11001 W. 120th Avenue Suite 400 Broomfield, Colorado 80021 / US | 02 /
BOUE, Stephen M. USDA-ARS-SRRC 1100 Robert E. Lee Boulevard New Orleans, LA 70124 / US | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited York Biotech Campus Office 14FA05 Sand Hutton York, YO41 1LZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited 106 Heworth Green York YO31 7TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14769814.6 | 10.03.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014US22359 | Priority number, date | US201361789614P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361789614 P | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014150139 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983662 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/35, A61K31/352, A61K36/48, A61P3/10, A61P3/04, A61P1/00, A61P43/00 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2236/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/07] | A61K31/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Title | German: | FASER AUS AKTIVIERTEN SOJABOHNENHÜLSEN | [2016/07] | English: | ACTIVATED SOY POD FIBER | [2016/07] | French: | FIBRE DE COSSE DE SOJA ACTIVÉE | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20110111133 ; | [XI]WO2011087857 (UNIV TULANE [US], et al) [X] 15 * the whole document * * claims 1,2,4,8-11,15,16 * [I] 1-9,11-14; | [Y]WO2012006750 (FRUTAROM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH], et al) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document * * page 3, line 1 - page 4 * * table 2 * * page 5, line 11 - line 34 * * page 6, line 7 - line 37 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 7 * * page 8, line 12 - line 14 * * claims 1,7,8,19 *; | [XYI] - BANKS, STEPHEN W. ET AL, "Biosynthesis of glyceollins I, II, and III in soybean", PHYTOCHEMISTRY (ELSEVIER) , 22(12), 2729-33 CODEN: PYTCAS; ISSN: 0031-9422, (1983), doi:10.1016/S0031-9422(00)97682-9, XP002760725 [X] 1,5,9,11-14 * the whole document * * page 2729, paragraph 2 * * abstract * * table 1 * * Scheme 1 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 4,6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)97682-9 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 78, Database accession no. 2011-N17033, XP002760734 & KR20110111133 A 20111010 (UNIV HOSEO ACADEMIC COOP FOUND) [X] 15 * abstract * [I] 1-9,11-14 | International search | [X]US2011237505 (BUROW MATTHEW E [US], et al); | [A]US2011281762 (SONNENBURG JUSTIN L [US], et al); | [Y]CN102743420 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG, et al); | [A]US2012269865 (ROUGHEAD ZAMZAM FARIBA [US], et al); | [A]US2013041022 (CLEVELAND THOMAS E [US], et al) |