EP2967680 - HOOK WITH ROTATING SADDLE AND ROTATABLE MONO AXIAL PEDICLE SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blackstone Medical, Inc. 3451 Plano Parkway Lewisville, Texas 75056 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMER, Michael 3300 Rachel Terrace Apt. 6 Pine Brook, New Jersey 07058 / US | 02 /
ZIOLO, Tara 43 Twin Oaks Trail Hewitt, New Jersey 07421 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14769960.7 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US24810 | Priority number, date | US201313839946 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313839946 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014151037 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2967680 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/7056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | HAKEN MIT ROTIERENDEM SATTEL UND DREHBARER EINACHSIGER PEDIKELSCHRAUBE | [2016/03] | English: | HOOK WITH ROTATING SADDLE AND ROTATABLE MONO AXIAL PEDICLE SCREW | [2016/03] | French: | CROCHET AVEC SELLE ROTATIVE ET VIS PÉDICULAIRE MONOAXIALE ROTATIVE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 18.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5810818 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1,6-10 * column 7, line 4 - column 9, line 23; figures 7-10 * [Y] 2-4,11,12; | [X]US5688273 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 13, line 65 - column 14, line 48; figure 15 *; | [Y]US2012209335 (TERMYNA STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1E *; | [Y]US2012010664 (RITLAND STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 11,12 * figure 1a *; | [A]US2011172714 (BOACHIE-ADJEI OHENEBA [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 18, 18A *; | [A]US5630816 (KAMBIN PARVIZ [US]) [A] 1 * figure 9 * | International search | [Y]US5810818 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [Y]US2011172714 (BOACHIE-ADJEI OHENEBA [US], et al); | [Y]US2012010664 (RITLAND STEPHEN [US]); | [Y]US5630816 (KAMBIN PARVIZ [US]); | [Y]US8287576 (BARRUS MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]US2011098755 (JACKSON ROGER P [US], et al); | [Y]US8007518 (WINSLOW CHARLES J [US], et al) |