EP2968632 - PROCESS FOR FOCUSED GAS PHASE APPLICATION OF BIOCIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/03] | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR FOCUSED GAS PHASE APPLICATION OF BIOCIDE | ||
[2020/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sabre Intellectual Property Holdings LLC 1891 New Scotland Road Slingerlands, NY 12159 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASON, John Y. 100 Orchard Hill Road Slingerlands NY 12159 / US | [2020/44] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
MASON, John Y. 2642 Marco Avenue Odessa, TX 79767 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2016/03] | Chung, Hsu Min HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | Application number, filing date | 14770164.3 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25884 | Priority number, date | US201313836721 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313836721 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014151512 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968632 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2968632 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, A61L2/00 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
A61L2/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2/0094 (EP,KR,US);
A61L9/00 (KR);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61L2202/121 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A61L2/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR FOKUSSIERTE GASPHASENANWENDUNG EINES BIOZIDS | [2020/52] | English: | PROCESS FOR FOCUSED GAS PHASE APPLICATION OF BIOCIDE | [2020/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'APPLICATION CIBLÉE DE BIOCIDE EN PHASE GAZEUSE | [2020/29] |
Former [2016/03] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONZENTRIERTEN GASPHASENVERWENDUNG EINES BIOZIDS | ||
Former [2016/03] | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR FOCUSED GAS PHASE APPLICATION OF BIOCIDE | ||
Former [2016/03] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'APPLICATION DE BIOCIDE FOCALISÉE EN PHASE GAZEUSE | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 11.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 21.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2020 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2014 | AL | 30.12.2020 | AT | 30.12.2020 | CY | 30.12.2020 | CZ | 30.12.2020 | DK | 30.12.2020 | EE | 30.12.2020 | ES | 30.12.2020 | FI | 30.12.2020 | HR | 30.12.2020 | IT | 30.12.2020 | LT | 30.12.2020 | LV | 30.12.2020 | MC | 30.12.2020 | MK | 30.12.2020 | MT | 30.12.2020 | NL | 30.12.2020 | PL | 30.12.2020 | RO | 30.12.2020 | RS | 30.12.2020 | SE | 30.12.2020 | SI | 30.12.2020 | SK | 30.12.2020 | SM | 30.12.2020 | LU | 13.03.2021 | BG | 30.03.2021 | NO | 30.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | IS | 30.04.2021 | PT | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
MK | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003136426 (AOYAGI KOHEI [JP]) [X] 12-14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0020] - [0022] - [0028] - [0031] - [0034] , [0037] , [0045] - [0050]; figure -; example -; claim - * [Y] 11,15,16 [I] 1-10; | [XYI]US2004062680 (KAMPA JOEL J [US]) [X] 12-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0006] - [0020] , [0027] - [0031] - [0034] , [0058] , [0059] , [0072] - [0075]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 11,15,16 [I] 1-10; | [XY]US2007163935 (CHEWINS JOHN G [GB]) [X] 12-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0074]; figure -; claim - *[Y] 10,11,15; | [XYI]US2010310418 (MASON JOHN Y [US], et al) [X] 12-16 * paragraphs [0029] - [0091]; figure -; example -; claim - * [Y] 11,15,16 [I] 1-11; | [XY]US2011238004 (CHEWINS JOHN GEORGE [GB], et al) [X] 12-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0020] - [0034] - [0058]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 10,11,15 | International search | [A]US1443315 (EHRHART RAYMOND N); | [Y]US2009071474 (FISHMAN ROYCE S [US]); | [A]CN201572402U (XIN YAO); | [X]US2010310418 (MASON JOHN Y [US], et al); | [A]US2011262342 (RICHARDSON DAVID E [US], et al) | Examination | GB2396559 | US2013164385 | - Heidi Hubbard ET AL, "Chlorine Dioxide Reactions with Indoor Materials during Building Disinfection: Surface Uptake", Environmental Science & Technology, US, (20090301), vol. 43, no. 5, doi:10.1021/es801930c, ISSN 0013-936X, pages 1329 - 1335, XP055691693 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/es801930c |