EP2975942 - TARGETED DISRUPTION OF T CELL RECEPTOR GENES USING ENGINEERED ZINC FINGER PROTEIN NUCLEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sangamo Therapeutics, Inc. 501 Canal Blvd. Suite A100 Richmond, CA 94804 / US | For all designated states Ospedale San Raffaele S.r.l. Via Olgettina 60 20132 Milano / IT | [2017/41] |
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Suite A100, 501 Canal Boulevard Richmond, CA 94804 / US | ||
For all designated states Ospedale San Raffaele S.r.l. Via Olgettina 60 20132 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGORY, Philip D. c/o SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC. 501 Canal Blvd. Suite A100 Richmond, California 94804 / US | 02 /
HOLMES, Michael C. c/o SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC. 501 Canal Blvd. Suite A100 Richmond, California 94804 / US | 03 /
PASCHON, David c/o SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC. 501 Canal Blvd. Suite A100 Richmond, California 94804 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Lei c/o SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC. 501 Canal Blvd. Suite A100 Richmond, California 94804 / US | 05 /
BONINI, Maria Chiara c/o OSPEDALE SAN RAFFAELE SRL Via Olgettina 60 I-20132 Milan / IT | 06 /
GENOVESE, Pietro c/o OSPEDALE SAN RAFFAELE SRL Via Olgettina 60 I-20132 Milan / IT | 07 /
MAGNANI, Zulma c/o OSPEDALE SAN RAFFAELE SRL Via Olgettina 60 I-20132 Milan / IT | 08 /
MASTAGLIO, Sara c/o OSPEDALE SAN RAFFAELE SRL Via Olgettina 60 I-20132 Milan / IT | 09 /
NALDINI, Luigi c/o OSPEDALE SAN RAFFAELE SRL Via Olgettina 60 I-20132 Milan / IT | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14770870.5 | 20.03.2014 | [2016/04] | WO2014US31360 | Priority number, date | US201361804076P | 21.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361804076 P | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014153470 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2975942 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2975942 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, C12N9/16, C12N15/00, C07H21/04 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
A61K35/26 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/0011 (US);
A61K39/001188 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL);
A61K39/4632 (EP,IL);
A61K39/464453 (EP,IL);
A61K39/464488 (EP,IL);
A61P31/00 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/06 (EP,IL);
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/87 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/907 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/5156 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,IL);
A61K2239/48 (EP,IL);
C12N2501/515 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEZIELTE DISRUPTION VON T-ZELL REZEPTORGENEN MIT MANIPULIERTEN ZINKFINGER-PROTEINNUKLEASEN | [2016/04] | English: | TARGETED DISRUPTION OF T CELL RECEPTOR GENES USING ENGINEERED ZINC FINGER PROTEIN NUCLEASES | [2016/04] | French: | INTERRUPTION CIBLÉE DE GÈNES DE RÉCEPTEUR DES LYMPHOCYTES T À L'AIDE DE NUCLÉASES PROTÉIQUES À DOIGT DE ZINC GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉES | [2016/04] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 16.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2014 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | PT | 08.12.2018 | IE | 20.03.2019 | LU | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.03.2014 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011158957 (BONINI MARIA CHIARA [IT], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * figure 3; example 7 * [I] 8; | [X] - ELENA PROVASI ET AL, "Editing T cell specificity towards leukemia by zinc finger nucleases and lentiviral gene transfer", NATURE MEDICINE, (20120401), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nm.2700, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 807 - 815, XP055181611 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2700 | [X] - H. TORIKAI ET AL, "A foundation for universal T-cell based immunotherapy: T cells engineered to express a CD19-specific chimeric-antigen-receptor and eliminate expression of endogenous TCR", BLOOD, (20120614), vol. 119, no. 24, doi:10.1182/blood-2012-01-405365, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 5697 - 5705, XP055071623 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012-01-405365 | [A] - ZHAO YANGBING ET AL, "Primary human lymphocytes transduced with NY-ESO-1 antigen-specific TCR genes recognize and kill diverse human tunior cell lines", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20050401), vol. 174, no. 7, doi:10.4049/JIMMUNOL.174.7.4415, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4415 - 4423, XP002669894 [A] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.174.7.4415 | International search | [Y]US2011158957 (BONINI MARIA CHIARA [IT], et al); | [Y]WO2012138939 (DUCHATEAU PHILIPPE [FR], et al) | Examination | WO2012012667 | WO2013074916 | - "Human TRAC gene target site, SEQ ID 128.", Geneseq, (20120315), Database accession no. AZS87188, URL: EBI | - "Human TRAC gene target site, SEQ ID 129.", Geneseq, (20120315), Database accession no. AZS87189, URL: EBI | - "Human TRBC gene target site, SEQ ID 130.", Geneseq, (20120315), Database accession no. AZS87190, URL: EBI | - "Human TRBC gene target site, SEQ ID 131.", Geneseq, (20120315), Database accession no. AZS87191, URL: EBI | by applicant | - ROBBINS ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2011), vol. 29, no. 7, pages 917 - 924 | - KANEKO ET AL., BLOOD, (2009), vol. 113, no. 5, page 1006 | - BONDANZA ET AL., BLOOD, (2011), vol. 117, no. 24, page 6469 | - AMENDOLA ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, pages 108 - 116 |