EP3046938 - BI- OR MULTISPECIFIC POLYPEPTIDES BINDING IMMUNE EFFECTOR CELL SURFACE ANTIGENS AND HBV ANTIGENS FOR TREATING HBV INFECTIONS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmholtz Zentrum München - Deutsches Forschungszentrum für Gesundheit und Umwelt (GmbH) Ingolstädter Landstrasse 1 85764 Neuherberg / DE | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROTZER, Ulrike Anzlgutstr. 45 81735 München / DE | 02 /
BOHNE, Felix Wildrosenweg 58 81929 München / DE | 03 /
MOMBURG, Frank Bachstr. 37 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
MOLDENHAUER, Gerhard Jahnstr. 11 34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | [2019/49] |
Former [2016/30] | 01 /
PROTZER, Ulrike Anzlgutstr. 45 81735 München / DE | ||
02 /
BOHNE, Felix Wildrosenweg 58 81929 München / DE | |||
03 /
MOMBURG, Frank Bachstr. 37 69121 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04 /
MOLDENHAUER, Gerhard Keplerstr. 22 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/30] | Application number, filing date | 14771250.9 | 16.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014EP69675 | Priority number, date | EP20130184635 | 16.09.2013 Original published format: EP 13184635 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015036606 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046938 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3046938 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/08, C07K16/28, C07K16/46, A61K39/395, A61P31/20 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
C07K16/2809 (EP,RU,US);
C07K16/082 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2239/53 (EP,RU,US);
A61K39/461 (EP,RU,US);
A61K39/464838 (EP,RU,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP,RU,US);
C07K16/283 (EP,RU,US);
C12N5/0638 (EP,RU,US);
C12N5/0646 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,US);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/35 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/524 (US);
C07K2317/526 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BI- ODER MULTISPEZIFISCHE POLYPEPTIDE WELCHE AN OBERFLÄCHENANTIGENE VON IMMUNEFFEKTORZELLEN UND AN HBV ANTIGENE BINDEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HBV-INFEKTIONEN UND VERWANDTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2019/31] | English: | BI- OR MULTISPECIFIC POLYPEPTIDES BINDING IMMUNE EFFECTOR CELL SURFACE ANTIGENS AND HBV ANTIGENS FOR TREATING HBV INFECTIONS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS | [2016/30] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES BI- OU MULTISPÉCIFIQUES SE LIANT AUX ANTIGÈNES DE SURFACE DES CELLULES EFFECTRICES IMMUNES ET AUX ANTIGÈNES DE HBV POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFECTION HBV ET CONDITIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2019/31] |
Former [2016/30] | BI-ODER MULTISPEZIFISCHE POLYPEPTIDE ZUR BINDUNG VON IMMUNEFFEKTOR-ZELLOBERFLÄCHEN-ANTIGENEN UND HBV-ANTIGENEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HBV-INFEKTIONEN UND VERWANDTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2016/30] | POLYPEPTIDES BISPÉCIFIQUES OU MULTISPÉCIFIQUES SE LIANT À DES ANTIGÈNES DE SURFACE DE CELLULE EFFECTRICE IMMUNITAIRE ET ANTIGÈNES DU VHB POUR TRAITER LES INFECTIONS PAR LE VIRUS DE L'HÉPATITE B ET ÉTATS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2019 | 25.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2014 | AL | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP2524699 (TRION RES GMBH [DE]); |