EP3038804 - THERMALLY INSULATED MELT PROCESSOR, AND RELATED PROCESS FOR MELT PROCESSING A POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/27] | THERMALLY INSULATED MELT PROCESSOR AND PROCESS FOR MELT PROCESSING WITH SAME | ||
[2019/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2020/17] |
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASSMER, Kevin Scott 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 02 /
EHRENSBECK, Franklin 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 03 /
ALLEN, Thad William 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 04 /
WALLACE, Stephen Michael 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 05 /
ABELL, Thomas Usher 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 06 /
HAGEDORN, Gerald 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | [2020/17] |
Former [2016/27] | 01 /
WASSMER, Kevin Scott 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | ||
02 /
EHRENSBECK, Franklin 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | |||
03 /
ALLEN, Thad William 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | |||
04 /
WALLACE, Stephen Michael 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | |||
05 /
ABELL, Thomas Usher 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | |||
06 /
HAGEDORN, Gerald 1 Lexan Lane 1 Lexan Lane, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2020/17] |
Former [2016/27] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14771438.0 | 29.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014US53348 | Priority number, date | US201361871685P | 29.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361871685 P | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015031720 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3038804 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3038804 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/42, B29B7/48, B29B7/82, // B29C48/03, B29C48/25, B29C48/68, B29C48/92 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
B29B7/488 (EP,KR,US);
B29B13/022 (US);
B29B7/428 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/823 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/826 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/275 (KR);
B29C48/78 (KR);
B29C48/802 (EP,US);
H05B1/023 (US);
H05B3/62 (US);
B29C2948/92704 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92895 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29C48/2565 (EP,US);
B29C48/68 (EP,US);
B29C48/832 (EP,US);
B29K2023/00 (US);
B29K2069/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | B29B7/42, B29B7/48, B29B7/82, B29C47/08, B29C47/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEISOLIERTER SCHMELZEPROZESSOR SOWIE DARAUF BEZOGENES VERFAHREN ZUR SCHMELZEBEHANDLUNG EINES POLYMERS | [2019/50] | English: | THERMALLY INSULATED MELT PROCESSOR, AND RELATED PROCESS FOR MELT PROCESSING A POLYMER | [2019/50] | French: | PROCESSEUR DE FUSION ISOLÉ THERMIQUEMENT, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ DE TRAITEMENT EN FUSION D'UN POLYMÈRE | [2019/50] |
Former [2016/27] | WÄRMEISOLIERTER SCHMELZPROZESSOR UND SCHMELZBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT | ||
Former [2016/27] | THERMALLY INSULATED MELT PROCESSOR AND PROCESS FOR MELT PROCESSING WITH SAME | ||
Former [2016/27] | PROCESSEUR DE FUSION ISOLÉ THERMIQUEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT EN FUSION AVEC CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 10.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2014 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | IE | 29.08.2020 | LU | 29.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 29.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 29.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0122887 (PIAZZOLA GAETANO) [X] 1-20,22 * page 3, paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 3 * * abstract * [A] 21; | [XA]GB2278262 (EXOTHERM PROD LTD [GB]) [X] 1-20,22 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 30 * * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 34 * * abstract * [A] 21; | [XY]WO0132396 (PENDERGRAFT GORDON M [US]) [X] 1-20,22 * page 1, lines 2-4 * * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 12 * * page 7, line 2 - page 10, line 14 * * abstract * [Y] 21; | [XY]EP1813414 (SMK METALL UND KUNSTOFFWAREN G [AT]) [X] 1-20,22 * paragraphs [0002] , [0020] - [0039] * * abstract * [Y] 21; | [XY]US2008136066 (TAYLOR BRUCE F [US], et al) [X] 1-20,22 * paragraphs [0001] - [0021] - [0054] - [0065] - [0074] , [0075] * * abstract * [Y] 21; | [XY]EP2127786 (KENNAMETAL HTM AG [CH]) [X] 1-20,22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] , [0011] - [0014] - [0019] * * abstract * [Y] 21; | [XY]US2010110823 (WOMER TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [X] 1-20,22 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0033] - [0044] * * abstract * [Y] 21; | [Y]US2012090819 (CHRISTIANO JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 21 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0020] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0029] , [0033] * * abstract *; | [A] - ROBERT SIKORA, "Semiconductor heaters stimulate new approach to plasticating systems", PLASTICS ENGINEERING,, (19831201), vol. 39, no. 12, pages 35 - 38, XP001353588 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |