EP3042281 - APPLICATION CUSTOMIZATION INITIATED AND DIRECTED FROM WITHIN THE APPLICATION ITSELF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLAWSON, Dean A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
BAR-CASPI, Doron c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
LINDHORST, Gregory S. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
AZIZ, Imran c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
VITON, Nichol C. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 14771667.4 | 03.09.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014US53770 | Priority number, date | US201361874677P | 06.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361874677 P | US201414320457 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US201414320457 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015034853 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3042281 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/0484 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (EP,US);
G06F8/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Title | German: | VON DER ANWENDUNG SELBST INITIIERTE UND GELEITETE ANWENDUNGSPERSONALISIERUNG | [2016/28] | English: | APPLICATION CUSTOMIZATION INITIATED AND DIRECTED FROM WITHIN THE APPLICATION ITSELF | [2016/28] | French: | PERSONNALISATION D'APPLICATION INITIÉE ET DIRIGÉE PAR L'APPLICATION ELLE-MÊME | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 24.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2018 | 28.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/12] | 09.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - Tim O'Brien ET AL, "Maven Integration for Eclipse, Developing with Eclipse and Maven", (20110501), pages 1 - 25, URL: http://books.sonatype.com/m2eclipse-book/pdf/m2ebook-pdf.pdf, (20141016), XP055147041 [X] 1-5 * figures 2.1,2.2,2.3,2.4,2.15 * * page 1, chapter 1.1, lines 1-2 and page 12, chapter 1.2, line 1 * * page 3, chapter 2.1, lines 1-3 * * page 3, whole chapter 2.2 * * page 4, last paragraph * * page 4, chapter 2.2.1, lines 4-5 * * page 5, last paragraph, line 1 * * page 7, chapter 2.2.3, last paragraph, lines 1-2 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 11, chapter 2.4, lines 1-4 * [I] 6-14 | [XI] - Elaine Marmel, "Download Apps from the Office Store", Teach Yourself Visually Office 2013, John Wiley & Sons, (20130318), pages 46 - 49, ISBN 978-1-11-851768-0, XP055118627 [X] 1-5 * page 46, lines 1-4 * * page 46/47, (1)-(8) * * page 47, tip box, lines 1-3 * * page 48, lines 1-6 * * page 48/49, (2),(3) * [I] 6-14 | [L] - "Amazon.com Web site - Teach Yourself Visually Office 2013", (20140519), URL: http://www.amazon.com/Teach-Yourself-VISUALLY-Office-2013-ebook/dp/B00C3LYVVI/ref=tmm_kin_swatch_0?_encoding=UTF8&sr=8-1&qid=1400491793, (20140519), XP055118687 [L] * (Indicates the publication date of the cited reference "Teach Yourself Visually Office 2013") * | Examination | - Sas Institute, "FSEDIT Procedure Windows Overview", (19991001), URL: http://www.okstate.edu/sas/v8/saspdf/fsproc/0921c04.pdf, (20161123), XP055322253 |