|
21.03.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
17.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2016 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |