EP3058026 - POLYETHYLENE FOR INJECTION MOULDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2016/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOECKER, Bernd Rheingaustrasse 105 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
LINDNER, Thomas Gehrenweg 7 64846 Groß-Zimmern / DE | 03 /
BISSON, Peter Heinz-Schifferdecker-Strasse 13 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
MANNEBACH, Gerd Krimmgasse 8 56294 Münstermaifeld / DE | [2016/34] | Representative(s) | LyondellBasell c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia Intellectual Property P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2020/16] |
Former [2016/34] | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 14771917.3 | 24.09.2014 | [2016/34] | WO2014EP70319 | Priority number, date | EP20130188689 | 15.10.2013 Original published format: EP 13188689 | [2016/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015055393 | Date: | 23.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3058026 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3058026 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3058026 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP,MX,RU,US);
C08F210/16 (RU,US);
C08F2410/04 (US);
C08F2500/05 (US);
C08F2500/12 (US);
C08F2500/13 (US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,US);
C08F4/7072 (EP,US);
C08L2201/08 (US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,MX,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/61904 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/7042 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/13 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Title | German: | POLYETHYLEN ZUM SPRITZGIESSEN | [2016/34] | English: | POLYETHYLENE FOR INJECTION MOULDING | [2016/34] | French: | POLYÉTHYLÈNE POUR MOULAGE PAR INJECTION | [2016/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.03.2018
Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE Opponent's representative Garcia Martin, Margarita Total Research & Technology Feluy Patent Department Zone Industrielle Feluy C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [2018/18] | 11.04.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.08.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.07.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.03.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2014 | AL | 28.06.2017 | AT | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | IE | 24.09.2017 | LU | 24.09.2017 | MT | 24.09.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | GB | 24.09.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010022941 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, lines 23-30; example 1 * * page 2, lines 8-20 * * page 7, lines 23-37 * * page 19, lines 9-10 *; | [A]WO2011020622 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, lines 1-17 ** page 7, lines 9-16 * | by applicant | US5008204 | WO9212182 | WO9303093 | WO9827124 | WO0031090 | WO2005103096 | - WILD ET AL., J. POLY. PHYS. ED., (1982), vol. 20 | - Handbook of PE | - RAFF; DOAK, High Polymers, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, JOHN WIELEY & SONS, (1965), vol. XX, page 443 | - Handbook of PE, MARCEL DEKKER INC., (2000), pages 7 - 10 | - W. HOLTRUP, MARKOMOL. CHEM., (1977), vol. 178, page 2335 | - JAMES C. RANDALL, JMS-REV. MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (1989), vol. C29, no. 2, 3, pages 201 - 317 | - C.J. CARMAN; R.A. HARRINGTON; C.E. WILKES, MACROMOLECULES, (1977), vol. 10, no. 3, page 536 | - M. KAKUGO; Y. NAITO; K. MIZUNUMA; T. MIYATAKE, MACROMOLECULES, (1982), vol. 15, no. 4, page 1150 | - J.C. RANDAL, MACROMOL. CHEM PHYS., (1989), vol. C29, page 201 | - WILD, L., "Temperature rising elution fractionation", ADV. POLYMER SCI., (1990), pages 1 - 47 | - U. BURKHARDT ET AL., Aufbereiten von Polymeren mit neuartigen Eigenschaften, VDI-VERLAG, (1995), page 71 | - "Size-Exclusion Chromatographic Assessment of Long-Chain Branch Frequency in Polyethylenes", SIMON PANG; ALFRED RUDIN, Chromatography of Polymers, (1993), vol. 521, pages 254 - 269 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 120, page 4049 | - J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN., (1998), page 849 | - BENOIT H.; REMPP P.; GRUBISIC Z., J. POLYMER SCI., PHYS. ED., (1967), vol. 5, page 753 | - M. FLEISSNER, KUNSTSTOFFE, (1987), vol. 77, page 45 | Opposition | WO2005103096 | DE102004020524 | WO2010022941 | WO2010088265 |