|
28.06.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
22.03.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |