Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
19.01.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.01.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.06.2016 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.06.2016 | Change - classification | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.06.2016 | Change - classification | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
03.06.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
19.02.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
19.02.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
16.02.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.10.2015 | Change - representative | |
21.10.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication |