Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9644553 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2017 | B2 | US2016061126 | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP50140 | 08.01.2014 | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9765714 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2017 | B2 | US2016053695 | 25.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | WO2014JP50142 | 08.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016047350 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | WO2014JP50139 | 08.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9897022 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2018 | B2 | US2016047339 | 18.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | WO2014JP50141 | 08.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6156485B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2017 | B2 | JPWO2014156208 | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | WO2014JP50139 | 08.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2998552 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2020 | B1 | EP2998552 | 27.07.2016 | A4 | EP2998552 | 23.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | WO2014JP50141 | 08.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2998551 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2022 | B1 | EP2998551 | 27.07.2016 | A4 | EP2998551 | 23.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | WO2014JP50142 | 08.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2998549 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2021 | B1 | EP2998549 | 08.03.2017 | A4 | EP2998549 | 23.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP50140 | 08.01.2014 | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2998550 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2016 | A4 | EP2998550 | 23.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | WO2014JP50139 | 08.01.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014156211 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014156210 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014156209 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014156208 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013066968 | 27.03.2013 |