EP2980457 - CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jatco Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAYAMA, Yoshiteru c/o JATCO Ltd 700-1 Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14773110.3 | 20.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014JP57881 | Priority number, date | JP20130061776 | 25.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013061776 | [2016/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014157002 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980457 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/662, F16H61/04, F16H61/12, F16H9/12, F16H55/56 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
F16H61/04 (EP,US);
F16H61/662 (EP,CN,US);
F16H61/66272 (US);
F16H55/171 (US);
F16H55/56 (EP,US);
F16H61/0437 (CN);
F16H61/12 (EP,CN,US);
F16H63/065 (EP,US);
F16H9/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | F16H61/662, F16H61/04, F16H61/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES GETRIEBE UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/05] | English: | CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION AND CONTROL METHOD | [2016/05] | French: | TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2015 | Translation filed | 05.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1972831 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,11 * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] *; | [Y]EP2256370 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-4,11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0034] , [0037]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2012082928 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) [A] 1-4,11* paragraphs [0023] , [0038] , [0052]; figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]GB356196 (FRANK ALBERT PESCHL); | [A]US2161913 (BERNARD DOYLE JAMES); | [A]WO03001084 (HAMMERBECK JOHN PHILIP ROGER [GB]); | [A]US2003166426 (ANDERSON LAWRENCE A [US]); | [A]JP2010014269 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [XP]JP2013241996 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | JP2010014269 |