EP2936220 - POLARIZATION CONVERSION SYSTEMS WITH GEOMETRIC PHASE HOLOGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ImagineOptix Corporation 10030 Green Level Church Road Suite 802-1260 Cary NC 27519 / US | [2022/46] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states ImagineOptix Corporation 10030 Green Level Church Road Suite 802-1260 Cary NC 27519 / US | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states North Carolina State University Campus Box 8210 Raleigh, NC 27695 / US | ||
For all designated states Imagineoptix Corporation 7202 Doverton Court Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESCUTI, Michael J. 122 Agassi Ct. Cary, North Carolina 27695 / US | 02 /
KIM, Jihwan 6211-104 Pitchkettle Rd. Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | 03 /
KOMANDURI, Ravi K. 43499 Ogden Place Dulles, VA 20166 / US | 04 /
CLARK, Erin 106 Lantern Ridge Ln. Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
ESCUTI, Michael J. 122 Agassi Ct. Cary, North Carolina 27695 / US | ||
02 /
KIM, Jihwan 6211-104 Pitchkettle Rd. Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | |||
03 /
KOMANDURI, Ravi K. 2509 Avent Ferry Rd. Apt. B Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | |||
04 /
CLARK, Erin 106 Lantern Ridge Ln. Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2015/44] | Yeadon, Mark Yeadon IP Limited Leeds Innovation Centre 103 Clarendon Road Leeds LS2 9DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 14774568.1 | 07.03.2014 | [2015/44] | WO2014US21680 | Priority number, date | US201361779304P | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361779304 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014159045 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2936220 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2936220 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
G02B5/32 (US);
F21V9/14 (US);
G02B27/283 (US);
G02B27/286 (EP,US);
G02B5/3016 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLARISATIONSUMWANDLUNGSSYSTEM MIT GEOMETRISCHEN PHASENHOLOGRAMMEN | [2015/44] | English: | POLARIZATION CONVERSION SYSTEMS WITH GEOMETRIC PHASE HOLOGRAMS | [2015/44] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CONVERSION DE POLARISATION À HOLOGRAMMES À PHASE GÉOMÉTRIQUE | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 22.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 15.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | AT | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | IT | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IE | 07.03.2023 | LU | 07.03.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | FR | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IE | 07.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.03.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
FR | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IE | 07.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.03.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IE | 07.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.03.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
LU | 07.03.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0720040 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-19* figure 1 *; | [A]GB2410339 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-19 * figure 4 *; | [I] - Kim Jihwan, "Liquid Crystal Geometric Phase Holograms for Efficient Beam Steering and Imaging Spectropolarimetry", (20110510), URL: http://repository.lib.ncsu.edu/ir/bitstream/1840.16/7170/1/etd.pdf, (20160801), XP055292429 [I] 1-19 * pages 24-29 * | [A] - EUNSEONG SEO ET AL, "39.2: Polarization Conversion System Using a Polymer Polarization Grating", SID SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, (20110601), vol. 42, no. 1, doi:10.1889/1.3621380, ISSN 0097-966X, pages 540 - 543, XP055189160 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1889/1.3621380 | [A] - JIHWAN KIM ET AL, "Efficient and monolithic polarization conversion system based on a polarization grating", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, vol. 51, no. 20, doi:10.1364/AO.51.004852, ISSN 0003-6935, (20120710), pages 4852 - 4857, (20120709), XP001577047 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.51.004852 | International search | [Y]US2002093718 (SLACK JASON KEMPTON [GB], et al); | [A]KR100565884B (ROLIC AG); | [A]KR20060048078 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]US2012188467 (ESCUTI MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2013027656 (ESCUTI MICHAEL J [US], et al) | Examination | JP2005274847 | by applicant | US5986809 | US5995284 | US6621533 |