EP2980693 - PRINT CONTROL DEVICE, PRINT DEVICE, DATA PROCESSING METHOD, AND PRINT CONTROL DEVICE SETTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Yusuke c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14774991.5 | 25.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014JP01716 | Priority number, date | JP20130072437 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013072437 | JP20130072438 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013072438 | JP20130072439 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013072439 | [2016/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014156130 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980693 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, B41J5/30, B41J29/38, H04N1/54, H04N1/56 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
B41J5/30 (EP,US);
B41J11/008 (EP,US);
B41J2/21 (EP,US);
B41J3/46 (EP,US);
G06F3/1206 (EP,US);
G06F3/1215 (US);
G06F3/1243 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US);
H04N1/3872 (EP);
H04N1/54 (EP,US);
H04N1/56 (EP,US);
B41J3/4075 (EP);
G01J3/463 (US);
G06F40/106 (US);
G06K15/1885 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | G06F3/12, B41J5/30, B41J29/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | DRUCKSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DRUCKVORRICHTUNG, DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND EINSTELLVERFAHREN FÜR DRUCKSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/05] | English: | PRINT CONTROL DEVICE, PRINT DEVICE, DATA PROCESSING METHOD, AND PRINT CONTROL DEVICE SETTING METHOD | [2016/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'IMPRESSION, DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'IMPRESSION | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2015 | Translation filed | 29.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 19.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004012816 (MINOWA MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 14] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0093] * * paragraphs [0109] - [0150] * * figures 2-7, 14-17 *[I] 4,8 | International search | [Y]JPH07223346 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003266804 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2009171254 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2011042103 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | by applicant | JP2003266804 |