Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2967661 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2967661



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(61)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 303
08.07.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
04.07.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.06.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.06.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
17.06.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
17.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
22.02.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 27
21.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
21.09.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 17
21.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
21.09.2018 Description Search / examination 16
21.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.09.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
22.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.05.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.05.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.09.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.09.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
29.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.09.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.03.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
13.03.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.03.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 6
13.03.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.03.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
02.01.2017 Amendments not yet acceptable Search / examination 2
16.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Annex Search / examination 4
16.12.2016 Annex Search / examination 4
16.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 5
19.10.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
19.10.2016 Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched Search / examination 2
12.10.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.11.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
16.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
23.09.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.02.2015 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
19.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
19.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
19.01.2015 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.01.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
02.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 7
02.10.2014 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 29