EP2981155 - INDUCTION HEATING COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hidekazu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Tomoya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Kenji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
ISAGO, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
ANDO, Shumpei c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
YOKONO, Masahiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
NAGATA, Ryuuji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
AIHARA, Katsuyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 09 /
USHIO, Shozo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/10] |
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hidekazu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI, Tomoya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
OGAWA, Kenji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
ISAGO, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
ANDO, Shumpei c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
06 /
YOKONO, Masahiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
07 /
NAGATA, Ryuuji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
08 /
AIHARA, Katsuyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
09 /
USHIO, Shozo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14775568.0 | 10.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014JP01342 | Priority number, date | JP20130068098 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013068098 | JP20130158595 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013158595 | [2016/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014156010 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981155 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2981155 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
H05B6/1245 (EP,US);
H05B6/1209 (US);
H05B6/1254 (EP,US);
H05B6/1263 (EP,US);
H05B2206/022 (EP,US);
H05B6/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHVORRICHTUNG MIT INDUKTIONSERHITZUNG | [2016/05] | English: | INDUCTION HEATING COOKING DEVICE | [2016/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON PAR CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2014 | Translation filed | 28.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 29.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2014 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | IE | 10.03.2020 | LU | 10.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | FR | 04.05.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | GB | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 10.03.2014 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 04.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.03.2014 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 04.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 04.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1005254 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 2* figure 1 *; | [Y]US6410892 (PERSCHL FRANZ [US], et al) [Y] 2,4-7 * column 3; figure 3 *; | [XI]EP2408262 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,9 * figure 1b * [I] 2-7; | [XYI]EP2427032 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0006]; figure 5 * [Y] 2,4-7 [I] 8,9 | International search | [Y]JP2009011400 (CLEANUP CORP); | [X]WO2010103766 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2012243602 (PANASONIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2002033184 | JP2004172138 |