EP2980647 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/05] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE | ||
[2018/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyobo Co., Ltd. 2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAWATA, Yukimi c/o Toyobo Co., Ltd. 3-1 Kanaokahigashi-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 704-8194 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIOKA, Daiki c/o Toyobo Co., Ltd. 3-1 Kanaokahigashi-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 704-8194 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMOTO, Kazuya c/o Toyobo Co., Ltd. 3-1 Kanaokahigashi-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 704-8194 / JP | [2018/19] |
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
YAWATA, Yukimi c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD. 3-1 Kanaokahigashi-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 704-8194 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHIOKA, Daiki c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD. 3-1 Kanaokahigashi-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 704-8194 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIMOTO, Kazuya c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD. 3-1 Kanaokahigashi-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 704-8194 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14775753.8 | 24.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014JP58034 | Priority number, date | JP20130068356 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013068356 | [2016/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014157064 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980647 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2980647 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/40, G03F7/00, G03F7/033, B41N3/08 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
G03F7/405 (EP,US);
B41C1/05 (US);
B05D1/18 (US);
G03F7/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLEXODRUCKPLATTE | [2016/05] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE | [2018/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE FLEXOGRAPHIQUE D'IMPRESSION | [2016/05] |
Former [2016/05] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2015 | Translation filed | 09.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 04.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2014 | AL | 09.05.2018 | AT | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.03.2014 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007106844 (PARKER CORP) [Y] 1-3* paragraph [0013]; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]EP2520440 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * synthetic example 1;; example 1; claims 1-6 * | International search | [A]WO2005064413 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007106844 (PARKER CORP); | [A]WO2011081084 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS5147805 | JPS6388555 | JPH05134410 | JPH10171111 | JP2002292985 | WO2005064413 | WO2007116941 | WO2011081084 |